Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1974277 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1974277



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(38)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 399
14.02.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.04.2013 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
14.03.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
26.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.02.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 11
26.02.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 11
26.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.11.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.11.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.11.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.11.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 51
22.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.06.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
22.06.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
22.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.12.2011 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
06.12.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.12.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 4
06.12.2011 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
18.12.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.12.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.12.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.09.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
03.09.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.08.2008 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
07.08.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
07.08.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
07.08.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
07.08.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
31.07.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.07.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
31.07.2008 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 34
31.07.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
28.07.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
26.05.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
06.08.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 64
06.08.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 102
19.07.2007 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 57