EP2055100 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING RECEIVER AND RECEIVER USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2013 [2013/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Eun Hyung 642, Sinpyeong-dong, Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do, 730-070 / KR | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07701068.4 | 31.01.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007KR00532 | Priority number, date | KR20060074213 | 07.08.2006 Original published format: KR 20060074213 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008018670 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055100 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 14.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/76, H04N5/445 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (KR);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES EMPFÄNGERS UND DIESES VERWENDENDER EMPFÄNGER | [2009/19] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING RECEIVER AND RECEIVER USING THE SAME | [2009/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN RÉCEPTEUR ET RÉCEPTEUR UTILISANT CE PROCÉDÉ | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 08.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/05] | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004128317 (SULL SANGHOON [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0136] , [ 137] , [ 144]; figure 2b *; | [X]US2006064716 (SULL SANGHOON [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0346] - paragraph [0350]; figure 9a *; | [AP]EP1746600 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [AP] 1-15 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2005069283 (MITSUYU NORIHISA [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0063]; figure 4 *; | [A]EP1435619 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0397] - paragraph [0399] *; | [A]US2002178450 (MORITA KOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2006110128 (DUNTON RANDY R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2005278774 (ESHLEMAN MATTHEW A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO9856187 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]); | [A]US2005048916 (SUH JONG YEUL [KR]) |