EP1977293 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING DATA BETWEEN SUBSCRIBERS IN A BUS SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING MACHINES AND INSTALLATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Opposition rejected | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sigmatek GmbH & Co KG Bürmooserstrasse 10 5112 Lamprechtshausen / AT | [2010/27] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Sigmatek GmbH & Co. KG Bürmooserstrasse 10 5112 Lamprechtshausen / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSEJKO, Theodor Ahornweg 6 A-5112 Lamprechtshausen / AT | 02 /
MELKUS, Andreas Mayrhofweg 7 A-5110 Oberndorf / AT | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 07701277.1 | 25.01.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007AT00030 | Priority number, date | AT20060000112 | 25.01.2006 Original published format: AT 1122006 | [2008/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007085033 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977293 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977293 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/00, G06F12/00, H04L12/403 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
H04L12/403 (EP);
H04L2012/4026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN ZWISCHEN TEILNEHMERN IN EINEM BUSSYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG VON MASCHINEN UND ANLAGEN | [2008/41] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING DATA BETWEEN SUBSCRIBERS IN A BUS SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING MACHINES AND INSTALLATIONS | [2008/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES ENTRE DES ABONNES DANS UN SYSTEME DE BUS POUR LA COMMANDE DE MACHINES ET D'INSTALLATIONS | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 16.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Beckhoff Automation GmbH Eiserstrasse 5 33415 Verl / DE Opponent's representative Wilhelm, Jürgen Wilhelm & Beck Patentanwälte Prinzenstraße 13 D-80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Beckhoff Automation GmbH Eiserstrasse 5 33415 Verl / DE Opponent's representative Wilhelm, Jürgen Wilhelm & Beck Patentanwälte Prinzenstraße 13 D-80639 München / DE | 20.05.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.11.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.09.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.09.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 13.01.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/22] | Appeal following opposition | 27.09.2013 | Appeal received No. T2087/13 | 13.01.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.07.2010 | CZ | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | IE | 07.07.2010 | IT | 07.07.2010 | LT | 07.07.2010 | LV | 07.07.2010 | PL | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SE | 07.07.2010 | SI | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | ES | 18.10.2010 | IS | 07.11.2010 | PT | 08.11.2010 | FR | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/49] |
Former [2013/45] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
HU | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
TR | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
GB | 25.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
TR | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
GB | 25.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5495240 (HEBERLE KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 2, lines 12-34 * * column 3, lines 31-65 * * column 4, lines 22-25 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US5758127 (MACAULAY IAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figure 10a * * column 8, lines 35-54 *; | [A]US6141736 (ABERT MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-8* abstract * | by applicant | US5495240 |