EP1991823 - SYSTEM, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSFERRING HEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gridex Power Pty Ltd 76C Wilford Street Newton, NSW 2042 / AU | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMBERS, Colin James 8/43-57 Mallet Street Camperdown, New South Wales 2050 / AU | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene BORENIUS & Co Oy AB Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 07701504.8 | 16.02.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007AU00173 | Priority number, date | AU20060900907 | 23.02.2006 Original published format: AU 2006900907 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007095669 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1991823 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/04, C02F11/04, F28D7/10, C12P5/02, F28D9/04, C02F1/02, C02F3/28 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
F28D1/0213 (EP,US);
C02F1/02 (EP,US);
C12M23/36 (EP,US);
C12M41/18 (EP,US);
C12M41/20 (EP,US);
C12P5/023 (EP,US);
F28D1/06 (EP,US);
F28D7/106 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (EP,US);
C02F1/76 (EP,US);
C02F2103/002 (EP,US);
C02F2209/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNG | [2008/47] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSFERRING HEAT | [2008/47] | French: | SYSTEME, PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 01.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.04.2009 | 28.02.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8000694 (SORENSEN K); | [X]US4100023 (MCDONALD BYRON A); | [X]US4698310 (WIKHOLM BERT S [SE], et al); | [X]US6299774 (AINSWORTH JACK L [US], et al); | [Y]US5433842 (MORRIS NATHAN [US], et al); | [Y]US3848664 (PERRY E, et al); | [Y]WO2006041320 (MCGREGOR GARTH KENNEDY [NZ]); | [Y]DE102004053996 (NEUBAUER THOMAS [DE]); | [A]GB892757 (KARL ZINK); | [A]US6117203 (BUCHHAVE KARSTEN [DK], et al) | [X] - CENGEL Y.A., Heat Transfer, A Practical Approach, NEW YORK, WCB/MCGRAW-HILL, (1998), vol. CHAP10, pages 569 - 573, ISBN 0-7-011505-2 |