EP2007042 - WAVELENGTH DIVISION MULTIPLEXING SYSTEM AND RESIDUAL DISPERSION COMPENSATING DEVICE AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Likun ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jiaying ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Hatzmann, Martin Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07702022.0 | 10.01.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007CN00090 | Priority number, date | CN20061011478 | 10.03.2006 Original published format: CN200610011478 | [2008/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007104211 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2007042 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2007042 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/18, H04J14/02, // H04B10/08 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
H04B10/25133 (EP,US);
H04B10/2507 (KR);
H04B10/07951 (EP,US);
H04B10/2581 (KR);
H04J14/0307 (EP,KR);
H04B2210/252 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | H04B10/18, H04J14/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | WELLENLÄNGENMULTIPLEXSYSTEM UND RESTDISPERSIONSKOMPENSATIONSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/52] | English: | WAVELENGTH DIVISION MULTIPLEXING SYSTEM AND RESIDUAL DISPERSION COMPENSATING DEVICE AND METHOD THEREOF | [2008/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MULTIPLEXAGE PAR DIVISION DE LONGUEURS D'ONDE, DISPOSITIF DE COMPENSATION DE LA DISPERSION RÉSIDUELLE, ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2008 | Translation filed | 25.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 24.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.12.2014 | 02.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 01.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/51] | Appeal following examination | 06.02.2015 | Appeal received No. T1048/15 | 07.04.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.11.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0700178 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [I]EP0812075 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]); | [I]EP0902558 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [I]EP1385281 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) | International search | [A]CN1479478 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]); | [A]CN1518249 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]US6871024 (NISHIMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [X]CN1674475 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | Examination | US2002015207 | EP1347589 |