EP1924032 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR CONNECTING THE CALLED USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Dongming Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518219 / CN | 02 /
DUAN, Xiaoqin Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518219 / CN | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/17] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Riesstrasse 25 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/45] | Löfgren, Bengt Håkan Alpo, et al Groth & Co KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2008/21] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co 16 High Holborn GB-London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 07702029.5 | 10.01.2007 | [2008/21] | WO2007CN00097 | Priority number, date | CN2006100279 | 10.01.2006 Original published format: CN200610000279 | [2008/21] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007079688 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1924032 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1924032 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46, H04M3/42 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
H04L12/66 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR VERBINDUNG MIT EINEM GERUFENEN NUTZER | [2008/21] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR CONNECTING THE CALLED USER | [2008/21] | French: | PROCEDE, APPAREIL ET SYSTEME DE MISE EN COMMUNICATION DE L'UTILISATEUR APPELE | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | Translation filed | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 31.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2007 | AT | 18.05.2011 | BE | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | CZ | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | LT | 18.05.2011 | LV | 18.05.2011 | NL | 18.05.2011 | RO | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | IS | 18.09.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | IE | 10.01.2012 | LU | 10.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 10.01.2012 | ||
LU | 10.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 10.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 10.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
PT | 19.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]CN1391396 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]US2005041787 (CASEY STEVEN M [US], et al); | [A]US2005071455 (COLLINS DAVID ALLAN [US]) | by applicant | US2005041787 |