EP2122962 - Method for symbol synchronization of received digital signal and digital signal receiver using the same method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/48] | METHOD FOR SYMBOL SYNCHRONIZATION OF RECEIVED DIGITAL SIGNAL AND DIGITAL SIGNAL RECEIVER USING THE SAME METHOD | ||
[2013/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2013/22] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states THOMSON Licensing 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Gang 8th Floor, Building A Technology Fortune Center No. 8 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
ZOU, Li 8th Floor, Building A Technology Fortune Center No. 8 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2013/22] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
LIU, Gang 8th Floor, Building A Technology Fortune Center No. 8 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | ||
02 /
ZOU, Li 8th Floor, Building A Technology Fortune Center No. 8 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Representative(s) | Rossmanith, Manfred, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Rossmanith, Manfred, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2012/48] | Rossmanith, Manfred, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [N/P] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/48] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson European Patent Operations 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07702115.2 | 18.01.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007CN00183 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008089592 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2122962 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2122962 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
H04L27/2662 (EP,US);
H04L69/14 (KR);
H04L27/2678 (EP,US);
H04L27/2688 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | H04L29/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Symbolsynchronisation eines empfangenen Digitalsignals und das Verfahren verwendender Digitalsignalempfänger | [2013/03] | English: | Method for symbol synchronization of received digital signal and digital signal receiver using the same method | [2013/03] | French: | Procédé de synchronisation de symboles d'un signal numérique reçu et récepteur de signal numérique faisant appel à ce procédé | [2013/03] |
Former [2009/48] | VERFAHREN ZUR SYMBOLSYNCHRONISATION EINES EMPFANGENEN DIGITALSIGNALS UND DAS VERFAHREN VERWENDENDER DIGITALSIGNALEMPFÄNGER | ||
Former [2009/48] | METHOD FOR SYMBOL SYNCHRONIZATION OF RECEIVED DIGITAL SIGNAL AND DIGITAL SIGNAL RECEIVER USING THE SAME METHOD | ||
Former [2009/48] | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNCHRONISATION DE SYMBOLES D'UN SIGNAL NUMÉRIQUE REÇU ET RÉCEPTEUR DE SIGNAL NUMÉRIQUE FAISANT APPEL À CE PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 16.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2007 | AT | 29.05.2013 | BE | 29.05.2013 | CY | 29.05.2013 | CZ | 29.05.2013 | DK | 29.05.2013 | EE | 29.05.2013 | FI | 29.05.2013 | IT | 29.05.2013 | LT | 29.05.2013 | LV | 29.05.2013 | MC | 29.05.2013 | NL | 29.05.2013 | PL | 29.05.2013 | RO | 29.05.2013 | SE | 29.05.2013 | SI | 29.05.2013 | SK | 29.05.2013 | TR | 29.05.2013 | BG | 29.08.2013 | GR | 30.08.2013 | ES | 09.09.2013 | IS | 29.09.2013 | PT | 30.09.2013 | GB | 18.01.2014 | IE | 18.01.2014 | LU | 18.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.01.2007 | |
AT | 29.05.2013 | ||
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
GB | 18.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
GB | 18.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
GB | 18.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
GB | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 29.05.2013 | |
PT | 30.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5692008 (VAN NEE RICHARD D J [NL]) [A] 1,7 * claim 1 *; | [XI]US2005287956 (GOLDEN STUART A [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0075] * * figures 2, 3 * [I] 7-10; | [A] - SOUROUR E ET AL, "Delay tracking for direct sequence spread spectrum systems in multipath fading channels", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1999 IEEE 49TH HOUSTON, TX, USA 16-20 MAY 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990516), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/VETEC.1999.778090, ISBN 978-0-7803-5565-1, pages 422 - 426, XP010341907 [A] 1,7 * Section III.C * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1999.778090 | International search | [A]EP1005204 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO02087101 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2004012452 (OPEN SOLUTION CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]US2005100109 (NAGATA SATOSHI [JP], et al) |