EP1996423 - HYBRID VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEMIC Automotive Electric Motors GmbH Sickingenstrasse 29-38 10553 Berlin / DE | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRKE, Peter Märkische Allee 12 16548 Glienicke/Nordbahn / DE | 02 /
KELLER, Michael Schartenbergstrasse 25 76534 Baden-Baden / DE | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/49] | 01 /
BIRKE, Peter Sonnenblumenweg 49a 16548 Glienicke/Nordbahn / DE | ||
02 /
KELLER, Michael Schartenbergstrasse 25 76534 Baden-Baden / DE | Application number, filing date | 07702384.4 | 27.01.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007DE00150 | Priority number, date | DE20061013133 | 20.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006013133 | [2008/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007110011 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1996423 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/00 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
B60K6/28 (EP,US);
B60L3/0046 (US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B60L58/24 (EP,US);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
B60L58/27 (EP);
B60K2001/005 (EP,US);
B60L2240/662 (EP,US);
B60W2510/244 (EP);
B60W2510/246 (EP,US);
B60W2555/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/26] |
Former [2008/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDFAHRZEUG | [2008/49] | English: | HYBRID VEHICLE | [2008/49] | French: | VEHICULE HYBRIDE | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9926802 (OVONIC BATTERY CO [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * * page 26, column 15 - page 26, column 18 * * page 30, line 11 - page 30, line 13 ** figures 2,3,5 *; | [X]EP1030388 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0057] * * figures 1-13,27 *; | [X]US2001030069 (MISU MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0068] * * figures 1-13,16,20 * |