EP1971635 - PROTON-CONDUCTING POLYMER MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helmholtz-Zentrum Geesthacht Zentrum für Material- und Küstenforschung GmbH Max-Planck-Strasse 1 21502 Geesthacht / DE | For all designated states National Autonomous University of Mexico (Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México (UNAM)) Instituto de Investigaciones en Materiales Circuito Exterior s/n Ciudad Universitaria 04510, Apartado Postal 70-360 / MX | [2012/13] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states Helmholtz-Zentrum Geesthacht Zentrum für Material- und Küstenforschung GmbH Max-Planck-Strasse 1 21502 Geesthacht / DE | ||
For all designated states National Autonomous University of Mexico (Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México (UNAM)) Instituto de Investigaciones en Materiales Circuito Exterior s/n Ciudad Universitaria 04510, Apartado Postal 70-360 / MX | |||
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states GKSS-Forschungszentrum Geesthacht GmbH Max-Planck-Strasse 1 21502 Geesthacht / DE | ||
For all designated states National Autonomous University of Mexico (Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México (UNAM)) Instituto de Investigaciones en Materiales Circuito Exterior s/n Ciudad Universitaria 04510, Apartado Postal 70-360 / MX | |||
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states GKSS-Forschungszentrum Geesthacht GmbH Max-Planck-Strasse 1 21502 Geesthacht / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRITSCH, Detlev Kückallee 30B 21465 Reinbek / DE | 02 /
VETTER, Serge Burgunderweg 13 89075 Ulm / DE | 03 /
NUNES, Suzana Bellevueberg 34 21502 Geesthacht / DE | 04 /
SANSORES, Luis E. ap. 22, Revolution Mexico, DF 01020 N 1428 / MX | 05 /
ZOLOTUKHIN, Mikhail ap. 1304, Edif. México, Entrada I Unid integr Latinoamericana Avenida Universidad Mexico, DF 04350 N 2014 / MX | [2012/13] |
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
FRITSCH, Detlev Kückallee 30B 21465 Reinbek / DE | ||
02 /
VETTER, Serge Burgunderweg 13 89075 Ulm / DE | |||
03 /
NUNES, Suzana Bellevueberg 34 21502 Geesthacht / DE | |||
04 /
SANSORES, Luis E. ap. 22, Revolution Mexico, DF 01020 N 1428 / MX | |||
05 /
ZOLOTUKHIN, Mikhail ap. 1304, Edif. México, Entrada I Unid integr Latinoamericana, Avenida Universidad Mexico, DF 04350 N 2014 / MX | |||
Former [2008/39] | 01 /
FRITSCH, Detlev Kückallee 30B 21465 Reinbek / DE | ||
02 /
VETTER, Serge Kiefholzstr. 165A 12437 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
NUNES, Suzana Bellevueberg 34 21502 Geesthacht / DE | |||
04 /
SANSORES, Luis E. ap. 22, Revolution Mexico, DF 01020 N 1428 / MX | |||
05 /
ZOLOTUKHIN, Mikhail ap. 1304, Edif. México, Entrada I Unid integr Latinoamericana, Avenida Universidad Mexico, DF 04350 N 2014 / MX | Representative(s) | Grebner, Christian Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Grebner, Christian Georg Rudolf Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3 20095 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Grebner, Christian Georg Rudolf Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3 20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07702668.0 | 10.01.2007 | [2008/39] | WO2007EP00166 | Priority number, date | DE20061001770 | 12.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006001770 | [2008/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007082660 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1971635 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1971635 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/22, H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
C08J5/2243 (EP,US);
H01B1/122 (EP,US);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
H01M8/1025 (EP,US);
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
C08J2365/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Title | German: | PROTONENLEITENDE POLYMERMEMBRAN | [2008/39] | English: | PROTON-CONDUCTING POLYMER MEMBRANE | [2008/39] | French: | MEMBRANE POLYMERIQUE CONDUCTRICE DE PROTONS | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2007 | CY | 28.03.2012 | CZ | 28.03.2012 | DK | 28.03.2012 | EE | 28.03.2012 | FI | 28.03.2012 | IT | 28.03.2012 | LT | 28.03.2012 | LV | 28.03.2012 | NL | 28.03.2012 | PL | 28.03.2012 | RO | 28.03.2012 | SE | 28.03.2012 | SI | 28.03.2012 | SK | 28.03.2012 | TR | 28.03.2012 | BG | 28.06.2012 | GR | 29.06.2012 | ES | 09.07.2012 | IS | 28.07.2012 | PT | 30.07.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 28.03.2012 | |
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 28.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004121211 (ASANO YOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0032]; example -; claim - *; | [X]US2005116206 (KAKUTA MAYUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]US2005124769 (HARING THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005059007 (UNIV DAYTON [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * figures 1-7; example -; claim - *; | [X]US2005186460 (KANAOKA NAGAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005227138 (FUKUDA KAORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031]; example -; claim - *; | [X]US2005287410 (SAITO SHIN [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0064]; example -; claim - * | by applicant | US5525436 | US5716727 | US2004121211 | US2005287410 | - LI, Q. F., R. H. HE ET AL., "Approaches and recent development of polymer electrolyte membranes for fuel cells operating above 100 degrees C", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, (2003), vol. 15, no. 26, pages 4896 - 4915 |