EP1858749 - AXLE RAISING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAF-HOLLAND GmbH Hauptstrasse 26 63856 Bessenbach / DE | [2008/35] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states SAF-HOLLAND GmbH Hauptstrasse 26 63856 Bessenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOCK, Helmut Ringstrasse 16 63856 Bessenbach / DE | 02 /
PANKE, Harald Wiesenstr. 38 63856 Bessenbach / DE | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Clemens, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Bauer, Clemens, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Bauer, Clemens, et al Müller Schupfner - Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07702695.3 | 11.01.2007 | [2007/48] | WO2007EP00217 | Priority number, date | DE20061001839 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006001839 | [2007/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007082679 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1858749 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1858749 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D61/12, B60G9/00, B60G11/27 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
B62D61/125 (EP,US);
B60G11/27 (EP,US);
B60G9/003 (EP,US);
B60G2200/31 (EP,US);
B60G2202/152 (EP,US);
B60G2202/412 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ACHSHEBEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2007/48] | English: | AXLE RAISING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE | [2007/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE D'ESSIEU POUR VÉHICULE | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/48] | DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE D ESSIEU POUR VÉHICULE | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 18.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.08.2008 | CZ | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | EE | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | IE | 27.08.2008 | LT | 27.08.2008 | LV | 27.08.2008 | PT | 27.08.2008 | RO | 27.08.2008 | SI | 27.08.2008 | SK | 27.08.2008 | BG | 27.11.2008 | SE | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | IS | 27.12.2008 | LU | 11.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | HU | 28.02.2009 | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/45] | CY | 27.08.2008 | |
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
LU | 11.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
LU | 11.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
LU | 11.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 27.08.2008 | |
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
LV | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 27.08.2008 | |
IS | 27.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0836984 (WEWELER NV [NL]) [A] 1-3,7,8,13 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 32; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9838074 (BPW BERGISCHE ACHSEN KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,7,8,13 * figures 1,2,8,9; claims 1-3,5-7,20,21 *; | [A]WO0112495 (BOLER CO [US]) [A] 1,3,8,13 * figures 1,2,4,8 *; | [AD]DE20317350U (TRENKAMP & GEHLE [DE]) [AD] 1* figures 1,3,4 *; | [XP]EP1661739 (LOSADA ALVAREZ AGUEDA [ES]) [XP] 1-3,7,8,13 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0029]; figures 1,5,7,8; claim 1 * |