EP1981997 - PURIFICATION OF RAW JUICE FEATURING REDUCED LIME CONSUMPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Südzucker AG Mannheim/Ochsenfurt Maximilianstrasse 10 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AJDARI RAD, Mohsen Wormser Strasse 1 67283 Obrigheim / DE | 02 /
FRENZEL, Stefan Senecaweg 4 69469 Weinheim / DE | 03 /
SHAHIDIZENOUZ, Azar Wormser Strasse 1 67283 Obrigheim / DE | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Schwahn, Hartmut, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/17] |
Former [2008/43] | Schwahn, Hartmut, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07703059.1 | 26.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007EP00671 | Priority number, date | DE20061004103 | 28.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006004103 | [2008/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007085466 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1981997 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1981997 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C13B20/02, C13B20/04, C13B20/06 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
C13B20/02 (EP,US);
C13B20/04 (EP,US);
C13B20/06 (EP,US);
Y02P40/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/43] | C13D3/00, C13D3/02, C13D3/04, C13D3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHSAFTREINIGUNG MIT REDUZIERTEM KALKVERBRAUCH | [2008/43] | English: | PURIFICATION OF RAW JUICE FEATURING REDUCED LIME CONSUMPTION | [2008/43] | French: | ÉPURATION DE JUS BRUT À CONSOMMATION RÉDUITE DE CHAUX | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 27.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.01.2007 | CY | 23.04.2014 | EE | 23.04.2014 | FI | 23.04.2014 | IT | 23.04.2014 | LT | 23.04.2014 | LV | 23.04.2014 | MC | 23.04.2014 | RO | 23.04.2014 | SI | 23.04.2014 | SK | 23.04.2014 | BG | 23.07.2014 | GR | 24.07.2014 | IS | 23.08.2014 | PT | 25.08.2014 | [2017/40] |
Former [2015/43] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 23.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4795494 (TOTH LASZLO [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * column 2, line 13 - line 39; example - *; | [Y]US5480490 (TOTH LASZLO [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * column 2, line 16 - line 44 *; | [Y]US3089789 (NOTE ROBERT H VAN) [Y] 1-25 * figures 4,5 *; | [Y] - FROMMELT B, "Experiences of juice purification in beet sugar factories. A comparison of Klein Wanzleben, Germany, and Moorhead, USA.", INTERNATIONAL SUGAR JOURNAL, (1997), vol. 99, no. 1183, page 328, XP009083646 [Y] 1-25 * page 329 * |