EP1984787 - ILLUMINATION SYSTEM FOR A MICROLITHOGRAPHIC PROJECTION EXPOSURE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss SMT GmbH Rudolf-Eber-Strasse 2 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2011/10] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss SMT AG Rudolf-Eber-Strasse 2 73447 Oberkochen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANGLER, Johannes An der Reute 15 89551 Königsbronn / DE | 02 /
SIEKMANN, Heiko Weisse Steige 64 73431 Aalen / DE | 03 /
WEIBLE, Kenneth Cret-Taconnet 24 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 04 /
SCHARNWEBER, Ralf Schleifbrückenstr. 11 1 73430 Aalen / DE | 05 /
MAUL, Manfred Elchweg 29 73434 Aalen / DE | 06 /
DEGUENTHER, Markus Langäckerweg 20 73432 Aalen / DE | 07 /
LAYH, Michael Heulenbergweg 30 73432 Aalen / DE | 08 /
SCHOLZ, Axel Joseph-Haydn-Str. 40 73430 Aalen / DE | 09 /
SPENGLER, Uwe Schönblick 28 D-91757 Trochtelfingen / DE | 10 /
VÖLKEL, Reinhard Rue de Combat-Borel 17 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2009/12] |
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
WANGLER, Johannes An der Reute 15 89551 Königsbronn / DE | ||
02 /
SIEKMANN, Heiko Weisse Steige 64 73431 Aalen / DE | |||
03 /
WEIBLE, Kenneth Cret-Taconnet 24 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | |||
04 /
SCHARNWEBER, Ralf Schleifbrückenstr. 11 1 73430 Aalen / DE | |||
05 /
MAUL, Manfred Elchweg 29 73434 Aalen / DE | |||
06 /
DEGUENTHER, Markus Langäckerweg 20 73432 Aalen / DE | |||
07 /
LAYH, Michael Heulenbergweg 30 73432 Aalen / DE | |||
08 /
SCHOLZ, Axel Joseph-Haydn-Str. 40 73430 Aalen / DE | |||
09 /
SPENGLER, Uwe Schönblick 28 91757 Trochtelfingen / DE | |||
10 /
VÖLKEL, Reinhard Rue de Combat-Borel 17 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | |||
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
WANGLER, Johannes An der Reute 15 89551 Königsbronn / DE | ||
02 /
SIEKMANN, Heiko Weisse Steige 64 73431 Aalen / DE | |||
03 /
WEIBLE, Kenneth Cret-Taconnet 24 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | |||
04 /
SCHARNWEBER, Ralf Silcherstr. 13 73430 Aalen / DE | |||
05 /
MAUL, Manfred Elchweg 29 73434 Aalen / DE | |||
06 /
DEGUENTHER, Markus Langäckerweg 20 73432 Aalen / DE | |||
07 /
LAYH, Michael Himmlinger Weg 33 73430 Aalen / DE | |||
08 /
SCHOLZ, Axel Joseph-Haydn-Str. 40 73430 Aalen / DE | |||
09 /
SPENGLER, Uwe Schönblick 28 91757 Trochtelfingen / DE | |||
10 /
VÖLKEL, Reinhard Rue de Combat-Borel 17 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Representative(s) | Schwanhäusser, Gernot, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestrasse 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Schwanhäusser, Gernot, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte Epplestr. 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Schwanhäusser, Gernot, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte Epplestr. 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07703454.4 | 14.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007EP01267 | Priority number, date | US20060774850P | 17.02.2006 Original published format: US 774850 P | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007093396 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1984787 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1984787 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
G03F7/70075 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70191 (KR,US);
G02B27/0911 (US);
G02B3/0056 (US);
G03F7/70058 (KR,US);
G03F7/70083 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2009/12] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE MIKROLITHOGRAPHIE-PROJEKTIONS-BELICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/44] | English: | ILLUMINATION SYSTEM FOR A MICROLITHOGRAPHIC PROJECTION EXPOSURE APPARATUS | [2008/44] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECLAIRAGE POUR UN APPAREIL D'EXPOSITION DE PROJECTION MICROLITHOGRAPHIQUE | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 18.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5815248 (NISHI KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,30,31,43,58,85,91 * figure 1 * * figure 6 * * column 13, lines 8-28 * * column 12, lines 10-13 * [A] 89,90; | [X]JP2003090959 (RICOH KK) [X] 86,92,93 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] ** figures 2,6 *; | [DX]US6583937 (WANGLER JOHANNES [DE], et al) [DX] 82 * figures 2A,2B * * column 11, lines 55-59 * * figure 7A *; | [DX]WO2005078522 (ZEISS CARL SMT AG [DE], et al) [DX] 83,84 * figures 1,4,19-21 * * page 35, line 12 - page 36, line 14 * |