EP1981926 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF OPEN-CELL VISCOELASTIC SOFT POLYURETHANE FOAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Stephan Heinrich-Witte-Strasse 40 49179 Ostercappeln / DE | 02 /
MEYER, Stefan Körnerstrasse 5 49661 Cloppenburg / DE | [2008/43] | Application number, filing date | 07703882.6 | 16.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007EP50367 | Priority number, date | EP20060100959 | 27.01.2006 Original published format: EP 06100959 | [2008/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007085548 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1981926 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1981926 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/36 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
C08G18/6696 (EP,US);
C08J9/22 (KR);
C08G18/2835 (EP,US);
C08G18/36 (KR);
C08G18/70 (KR);
C08G18/82 (KR);
C08G2110/0008 (EP,US);
C08G2110/005 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0058 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OFFENZELLIGEN VISKOELASTISCHEN POLYURETHAN-WEICHSCHAUMSTOFFEN | [2008/43] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF OPEN-CELL VISCOELASTIC SOFT POLYURETHANE FOAMS | [2008/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MOUSSES SOUPLES DE POLYURÉTHANNE VISCOÉLASTIQUES À PORES OUVERTS | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 27.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.05.2009 | CZ | 27.05.2009 | EE | 27.05.2009 | FI | 27.05.2009 | IE | 27.05.2009 | LT | 27.05.2009 | LV | 27.05.2009 | RO | 27.05.2009 | SI | 27.05.2009 | SK | 27.05.2009 | TR | 27.05.2009 | BG | 27.08.2009 | SE | 27.08.2009 | GR | 28.08.2009 | IS | 27.09.2009 | LU | 16.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
LU | 16.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 27.05.2009 | |
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 27.05.2009 | |
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | CZ | 27.05.2009 | |
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 27.05.2009 | |
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | FI | 27.05.2009 | |
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19924802 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * page 2, line 54 - page 2, line 27 * * table 1 * * claims 1-3,12 *; | [A]WO03046041 (HUNTSMAN INT LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 4, line 19 - page 6, line 19 * * page 16, line 25 - page 16, line 31 * * page 21, line 7 - page 21, line 31 * * tables 1-4 * * claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]US2005070620 (HERRINGTON RON [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0073] - [0077] * * claims 1,19,20,62 *; | [A]US2005210595 (DI STASIO ANTHONY A [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0015] - [0022] ** claims 1,7,14 * |