EP1979326 - PYRIDINE AND PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF HISTONE DEACETYLASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2012/40] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica, N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCONNET-DECRANE, Laurence, Françoise, Bernadette Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development; Division of Janssen-Cilag Campus De Maigremont BP 615 F-27106 Val de Reuil Cedex / FR | 02 /
GAURRAND, Sandrine, Françoise, Dominique Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development; Division of Janssen-Cilag Campus De Maigremont BP 615 F-27106 Val de Reuil Cedex / FR | 03 /
ANGIBAUD, Patrick, René Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development; Division of Janssen-Cilag Campus De Maigremont BP 615 F-27106 Val de Reuil Cedex / FR | [2012/40] |
Former [2008/42] | 01 /
MARCONNET-DECRANE, Laurence, Françoise, Bernadette Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development; Division of Janssen-Cilag Campus De Maigremont BP 615 F-27106 Val de Reuil Cedex / FR | ||
02 /
GAURRAND, Sandrine, Françoise, Dominique Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development; Division of Janssen-Cilag Campus De Maigremont BP 615 F-27106 Val de Reuil Cedex / FR | |||
03 /
ANGIBAUD, Patrick, René Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development; Division of Janssen-Cilag Campus De Maigremont BP 615 F-27106 Val de Reuil Cedex / FR | Representative(s) | Vandersteen, Pieter Johnson & Johnson Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Vandersteen, Pieter Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | ||
Former [2008/42] | Vandersteen, Pieter Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Application number, filing date | 07703886.7 | 16.01.2007 | [2008/42] | WO2007EP50371 | Priority number, date | EP20060100570 | 19.01.2006 Original published format: EP 06100570 | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007082874 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1979326 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1979326 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/78, C07D239/42, C07D409/14, C07D403/12, A61K31/506, A61P35/00 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D213/78 (EP,US);
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/42] | C07D239/42, C07D409/14, C07D403/12, A61K31/506, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/42] | Extension states | AL | 19.08.2008 | BA | 19.08.2008 | HR | 19.08.2008 | MK | 19.08.2008 | RS | 19.08.2008 | Title | German: | PYRIDIN- UND PYRIMIDINDERIVATE ALS INHIBITOREN VON HISTONDEACETYLASE | [2008/42] | English: | PYRIDINE AND PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF HISTONE DEACETYLASE | [2008/42] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRIDINE ET DE PYRIMIDINE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS D'HISTONE DÉSACÉTYLASE | [2008/42] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 23.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2007 | AT | 03.10.2012 | CY | 03.10.2012 | CZ | 03.10.2012 | EE | 03.10.2012 | FI | 03.10.2012 | LT | 03.10.2012 | LV | 03.10.2012 | PL | 03.10.2012 | RO | 03.10.2012 | SI | 03.10.2012 | SK | 03.10.2012 | TR | 03.10.2012 | BG | 03.01.2013 | GR | 04.01.2013 | LU | 16.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | IS | 03.02.2013 | PT | 04.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 03.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [PA]WO2006010749 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [PA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO2005030705 (METHYLGENE INC [CA], et al) [DY] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO03092686 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [DY] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO03075929 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [DY] 1-12 * the whole document * |