EP1989422 - ADAPTIVE POSITIONING METHOD FOR AN ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOKKELMAN, Joris Böhmerwaldstr. 2 93105 Tegernheim / DE | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Dirk Auenstr. 26 85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE | [2008/46] | Application number, filing date | 07704636.5 | 19.02.2007 | [2008/46] | WO2007EP51555 | Priority number, date | DE20061008051 | 21.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006008051 | [2008/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007096327 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1989422 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02D11/10, F02D41/24 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
F02D11/10 (EP,US);
F02D11/106 (EP,US);
F02D41/2464 (EP,US);
F02D2041/141 (EP,US);
F02D41/2438 (EP,US);
F02D41/2441 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVES POSITIONIERVERFAHREN EINES STELLGLIEDS | [2008/46] | English: | ADAPTIVE POSITIONING METHOD FOR AN ACTUATOR | [2008/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT ADAPTATIF D'UN ACTIONNEUR | [2008/46] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1517023 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0041] *; | [Y]US2004231641 (WIND ROBERT HAROLD [US]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0014] *; | [A]US5033431 (POIRIER DAVID C [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 4-6 * * column 4, line 49 - column 7, line 52 * |