EP1987071 - LAN CABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Specialty Polymers Italy S.p.A. Via Lombardia, 20 20021 Bollate (MI) / IT | [2012/08] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states Solvay Solexis S.p.A. Via Turati, 12 20121 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLAIANNA, Pasqua Via L. Varanini, 29/C I-20127 Milano / IT | 02 /
BRINATI, Giulio Via Oglio, 1 I-20139 Milano / IT | 03 /
SANGUINETI, Aldo Viale Campania, 31 I-20133 Milano / IT | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de la Fusée, 98 1130 Haren / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2009/11] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay (Société Anonyme) Intellectual Property Department Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2008/45] | Sama, Daniele Sama Patents, Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07704660.5 | 20.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007EP51591 | Priority number, date | IT2006MI00327 | 23.02.2006 Original published format: IT MI20060327 | IT2006MI00329 | 23.02.2006 Original published format: IT MI20060329 | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007096347 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1987071 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1987071 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08F214/26, C09D127/18, H01B3/44 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
C08F214/184 (EP,US);
C08F214/262 (EP,US);
C09D127/18 (EP,US);
H01B3/445 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Title | German: | LAN-KABEL | [2008/45] | English: | LAN CABLES | [2008/45] | French: | CABLES DE RESEAU LOCAL | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 23.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2007 | AT | 13.06.2012 | BE | 13.06.2012 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | IT | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | LV | 13.06.2012 | NL | 13.06.2012 | PL | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | SE | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | GR | 14.09.2012 | ES | 24.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | IE | 20.02.2013 | LU | 20.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0633274 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [X] 1-17 * examples 1,4; claim - *; | [DX]US4262101 (HARTWIMMER ROBERT ET AL) [DX] 1-17 * column 12, lines 46-48; claim - *; | [X]US4029868 (CARLSON DANA PETER) [X] 1-17 * column 4, lines 7-10; claim - *; | [X]WO9810012 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 8, lines 1-10 * * page 15, line 2 *; | [X]EP0423995 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-17 * example 3; claim - *; | [X]WO0180253 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-17 * claim - *; | [X]US4764538 (BUCKMASTER MARLIN D [US] ET AL) [X] 1-17 * example 8 *; | [X]US4963609 (ANDERSON JERREL C [US] ET AL) [X] 1-17 * example 3; claim - *; | [X]US2002111433 (LEE JEONG CHANG [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0006]; claim - *; | [X]US6696526 (KAULBACH RALPH [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-17 * column 3, lines 10-13; examples 1,2 * |