EP1984570 - PLOUGHING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/44] | RELEASE MECHANISM | ||
[2016/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lametal OY Kaskenviertäjäntie 2 FI-73100 Lapinlahti / FI | [2016/31] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Lametal OY Kaskenviertäjäntie 2 FI-73100 Lapinlahti / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIKAINEN, Unto Kihmulankatu 58 FI-74130 Iisalmi / FI | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Heinonen & Co Attorneys-at-Law Ltd Fabianinkatu 29 B 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | IPR Partners Ltd Hietalahdenranta 13 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2014/43] | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo, et al IPR Partners Oy Hietalahdenranta 13 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2008/44] | Rahkonen, Erkki Juhani Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 07704844.5 | 09.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007FI50074 | Priority number, date | FI20060005102 | 10.02.2006 Original published format: FI 20065102 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007090935 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1984570 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1984570 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 16.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E01H5/06, E02F3/815 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
E01H5/062 (EP);
E01H5/063 (FI);
E02F3/815 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PFLUGVORRICHTUNG | [2016/11] | English: | PLOUGHING APPARATUS | [2016/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TYPE CHARRUE | [2016/11] |
Former [2008/44] | FREIGABEMECHANISMUS | ||
Former [2008/44] | RELEASE MECHANISM | ||
Former [2008/44] | MECANISME DE LIBERATION | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 03.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 23.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.03.2016 | 29.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2007 | AT | 03.08.2016 | BE | 03.08.2016 | CY | 03.08.2016 | CZ | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | ES | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | IT | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | NL | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | TR | 03.08.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | GB | 09.02.2017 | IE | 09.02.2017 | LU | 09.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | FR | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.02.2007 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 09.02.2017 | ||
IE | 09.02.2017 | ||
LU | 09.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.02.2007 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 09.02.2017 | ||
IE | 09.02.2017 | ||
LU | 09.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 09.02.2017 | ||
IE | 09.02.2017 | ||
LU | 09.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 09.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 09.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]SE524151 (FLINKFELDT MARTIN [SE]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * page 3, lines 8-27 * * figure 3 * [I] 8; | [I]JP2000345525 (IWASAKI KOGYO KK) [I] 1-10 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE1759683 (BAAS GMBH) [A] 11-19 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US660276 (NOAKER MILTON K [US]); | [X]US3808714 (REISSINGER G, et al); | [X]US5185946 (FARRELL EUGENE A [US]); | [X]US4307523 (REISSINGER GOTTFRIED, et al) | by applicant | SE524151 | US660276 |