EP1984520 - HIGH THROUGHPUT TESTING FOR PRESENCE OF MICROORGANISMS IN A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rochester Investment Partners BM 6304 London WC1N 3XX / GB | [2010/28] |
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states Green, Simon 32 Novello Street London, W1G 0JN / GB | ||
For all designated states Semikhodskii, Andrei 134 Somerset Road Wimbledon, SW19 5HP / GB | |||
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Stirus Global Solutions Limited 4th Floor, 5-7 John Princes Street London W1G 0JN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEMIKHODSKII, Andrei 134 Somerset Road Wimbledon SW19 5HP / GB | 02 /
GREEN, Simon 134 Somerset Road Wimbledon SW19 5HP / GB | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Hopley, Joanne Selina, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Hopley, Joanne Selina, et al Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | ||
Former [2008/44] | Hopley, Joanne Selina, et al Keltie Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 07704973.2 | 23.01.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007GB00195 | Priority number, date | GB20060001302 | 23.01.2006 Original published format: GB 0601302 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007083147 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1984520 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1984520 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6834 (EP,US);
C12M1/28 (GB);
C12Q1/04 (GB);
C12Q1/24 (GB);
C12Q1/6837 (GB);
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US);
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6895 (EP,US);
C40B40/06 (GB);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6834, C12Q2565/518, C12Q2535/125, C12Q2531/113 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2565/518, C12Q2535/125 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TESTEN MIT HOHEM DURCHSATZ AUF DAS VORHANDENSEIN VON MIKROORGANISMEN IN EINER BIOLOGISCHEN PROBE | [2008/44] | English: | HIGH THROUGHPUT TESTING FOR PRESENCE OF MICROORGANISMS IN A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE | [2008/44] | French: | RECHERCHE A HAUT DEBIT DE MICRO-ORGANISMES DANS UN ECHANTILLON BIOLOGIQUE | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 30.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 05.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.11.2012 | 29.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.06.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 01.06.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2009 | 31.01.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2012 | 31.01.2013 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2007 | AT | 11.12.2013 | BE | 11.12.2013 | BG | 11.12.2013 | CY | 11.12.2013 | CZ | 11.12.2013 | DK | 11.12.2013 | EE | 11.12.2013 | ES | 11.12.2013 | FI | 11.12.2013 | IT | 11.12.2013 | LT | 11.12.2013 | LV | 11.12.2013 | MC | 11.12.2013 | NL | 11.12.2013 | PL | 11.12.2013 | RO | 11.12.2013 | SE | 11.12.2013 | SI | 11.12.2013 | SK | 11.12.2013 | TR | 11.12.2013 | IE | 23.01.2014 | LU | 23.01.2014 | GR | 12.03.2014 | IS | 11.04.2014 | PT | 11.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.01.2007 | |
AT | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 23.01.2014 | ||
LU | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 23.01.2014 | ||
LU | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 23.01.2014 | ||
LU | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 23.01.2014 | ||
LU | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 23.01.2014 | ||
LU | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 23.01.2014 | ||
LU | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 11.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9324659 (MICROPROBE CORP [US]); | [A]WO9403634 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al); | [A]US5654418 (SHEINESS DIANA K [US], et al); | [A]JP2002281980 (MITSUBISHI KAGAKU BIO CLINICAL); | [X]EP1473370 (BIO MERIEUX INC [US]); | Examination | DE19945916 | US2002187470 | by applicant | US5496562 | US5756126 | US5807527 | US5869242 | US5939259 | US5972386 | US5985327 | US6168922 | US6238871 | US6258538 | US6300076 | US6440705 | US6500621 | US6746841 | US6750059 | US6994969 |