EP1984661 - VARIABLE COMPRESSIBILITY GASKETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligent Energy Limited Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 3GB / GB | [2012/13] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Intelligent Energy Limited Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 3GR / GB | ||
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states Intelligent Energy Limited Citypoint One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9AH / GB | ||
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Intelligent Energy Limited The Registry 34 Beckenham Road Beckenham Kent BR3 4TU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOOD, Peter, David 1026 Melton Road Syston Leicester LE7 2NN / GB | 02 /
FOSTER, Simon, Edward 100 Mountsorrel Lane Rothley Leicester LE7 7PW / GB | [2014/49] |
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
HOOD, Peter, David 1026 Melton Road Syston Leicester LE7 2NN / GB | ||
02 /
FOSTER, Simon, Edward 100 Mountsorrel Lane Rothley Leicester LE7 7PW / GB | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2008/44] | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07705088.8 | 01.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007GB00324 | Priority number, date | GB20060001986 | 01.02.2006 Original published format: GB 0601986 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007088354 | Date: | 09.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1984661 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1984661 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/10 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
F16J15/104 (EP,GB,US);
F16J15/10 (KR);
F16J15/022 (GB);
H01M8/02 (GB);
H01M8/0263 (US);
H01M8/0276 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGEN MIT VARIABLER KOMPRESSIBILITÄT | [2008/44] | English: | VARIABLE COMPRESSIBILITY GASKETS | [2008/44] | French: | JOINTS A COMPRESSIBILITE VARIABLE | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 28.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2007 | AT | 03.12.2014 | BE | 03.12.2014 | BG | 03.12.2014 | CY | 03.12.2014 | CZ | 03.12.2014 | DK | 03.12.2014 | EE | 03.12.2014 | FI | 03.12.2014 | LT | 03.12.2014 | LV | 03.12.2014 | MC | 03.12.2014 | PL | 03.12.2014 | RO | 03.12.2014 | SE | 03.12.2014 | SI | 03.12.2014 | SK | 03.12.2014 | TR | 03.12.2014 | IE | 01.02.2015 | LU | 01.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | GR | 04.03.2015 | IS | 03.04.2015 | PT | 03.04.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
BE | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 03.12.2014 | |
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 03.12.2014 | |
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 03.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4721555 (GROSSHANDLER SANDOR [US]); | [X]US4846482 (BLODGETT MARK S [US], et al); | [X]US6543787 (INCIONG JOSEFINO T [US]); | [A]EP1302996 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]US2003091885 (KOBAYASHI SUSUMU [JP], et al) | Examination | JP2009525439 | by applicant | US2003091885 |