|
06.03.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.08.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2010 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.04.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
27.02.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Request for further processing allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2008 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
8 |