15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
13.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
09.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] |
28.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
16.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |
02.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
15.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |
15.07.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |
17.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
10.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
03.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
27.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
06.08.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
06.08.2010 |
Change - inventor |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
30.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.03.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
26.03.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
23.03.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.03.2010 |
Change: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
23.03.2010 |
Change: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
23.03.2010 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
23.03.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
19.03.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
16.03.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.03.2010 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
16.03.2010 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
16.03.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
12.03.2010 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] |
16.02.2010 |
Change: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
16.02.2010 |
Change: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
16.02.2010 |
Deletion: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
16.02.2010 |
Deletion: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
16.02.2010 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
16.02.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
10.02.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
22.01.2010 |
First examination report |
|
19.01.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.12.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] |
04.12.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] |
27.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.07.2009 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
24.07.2009 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
23.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.04.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|