Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2139503 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2010 | B1 | EP2139503 | 06.01.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007IB00177 | 26.01.2007 | FR0600813 | 30.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE480249T | 15.09.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007IB00177 | 26.01.2007 | FR0600813 | 30.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602007009133D1 | 21.10.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007IB00177 | 26.01.2007 | FR0600813 | 30.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007085946 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2008 | A3 | WO2007085946 | 02.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR0600813 | 30.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2896692 | 03.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0600813 | 30.01.2006 |