Designated contracting states | AT | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | BE | Lapse: 31.01.2011 | BG | Lapse: 08.12.2010 | CH | Lapse: 31.01.2011 | CY | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | CZ | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | DE | | DK | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | EE | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | ES | Lapse: 19.12.2010 | FI | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | FR | | GB | | GR | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | HU | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | IE | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | IS | Lapse: 08.01.2011 | IT | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | LI | Lapse: 31.01.2011 | LT | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | LU | Lapse: 26.01.2011 | LV | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | MC | Lapse: 31.01.2011 | NL | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | PL | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | PT | Lapse: 10.01.2011 | RO | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | SE | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | SI | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | SK | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | TR | Lapse: 08.09.2010 | Examination procedure | 23.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | | 27.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 27.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.2009 | 03   M06  
Fee paid on  
27.02.2009 | European patent granted | 08.09.2010 | Opposition procedure | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2011 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 06.01.2010 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20090519 | | Event date: | 06.01.2010 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 06.01.2010 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL BA HR MK RS | | Event date: | 24.02.2010 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20100121 | | Event date: | 14.04.2010 | | Event description: | TITLE (CORRECTION) | Free Format Text: | COSMETIC AND DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITIONS BASED ON ALGAE EXTRACTS | | Event date: | 21.04.2010 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Event date: | 08.09.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Event date: | 08.09.2010 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 15.09.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 21.10.2010 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 602007009133 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20101021 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 13.10.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH | | Event date: | 31.01.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 31.01.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 31.01.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 28.02.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 28.02.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 28.02.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 30.03.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FD4D | Code Expl.: | -EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID | | Event date: | 31.03.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 31.03.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 31.03.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 29.04.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 31.05.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 31.05.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110108 | | Event date: | 31.05.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 31.05.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 31.05.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110110 | | Event date: | 31.05.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 31.05.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 30.06.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20101219 | | Event date: | 17.08.2011 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20110609 | | Event date: | 31.08.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110131 | | Event date: | 31.08.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 31.08.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 25.02.2011 | | Event description: | LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 31.07.2011 | | Event description: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | TEXINFINE S.A. | Effective DATE: | 20110131 | | Event date: | 31.07.2011 | | Event description: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | INNOVAT | Effective DATE: | 20110131 | | Event date: | 31.07.2011 | | Event description: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | GIRMAUD, JEAN ALEXIS | Effective DATE: | 20110131 | | Event date: | 31.10.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110131 | | Event date: | 31.10.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110131 | | Event date: | 30.11.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110131 | | Event date: | 29.12.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL VDEP | Code Expl.: | -DISCONTINUED IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 31.05.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110126 | | Event date: | 30.09.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20101208 | | Event date: | 30.09.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 31.10.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 29.08.2014 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100908 | | Event date: | 13.10.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602007009133 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | Effective DATE: | 20110609 | | Event date: | 19.11.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB S117 | Code Expl.: | CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977) | Free Format Text: | REQUEST FILED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 21 OCTOBER 2014 | | Event date: | 03.12.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB S117 | Code Expl.: | CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977) | Free Format Text: | CORRECTIONS ALLOWED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 21 OCTOBER 2014, ALLOWED ON 10 NOVEMBER 2014 | | Event date: | 05.12.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR RM | Code Expl.: | CORRECTION OF A MATERIAL ERROR | Effective DATE: | 20141105 | | Event date: | 27.02.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME | OWNER: | ICP - TEXINFINE, FR | Effective DATE: | 20150123 | | Event date: | 27.02.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME | OWNER: | JEAN ALEXIS GRIMAUD, FR | Effective DATE: | 20150123 | | Event date: | 27.02.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME | OWNER: | INNOVAT, TN | Effective DATE: | 20150123 | | Event date: | 13.04.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602007009133 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | BOHMANN, DE | | Event date: | 21.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602007009133 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | INNOVAT, TN | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: JEAN ALEXIS GIRMAUD, INNOVAT, TEXINFINE S.A., , FR | Effective DATE: | 20150413 | | Event date: | 21.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602007009133 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | ICP-TEXINFINE, FR | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: JEAN ALEXIS GIRMAUD, INNOVAT, TEXINFINE S.A., , FR | Effective DATE: | 20150413 | | Event date: | 21.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602007009133 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | GRIMAUD, JEAN ALEXIS, FR | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: JEAN ALEXIS GIRMAUD, INNOVAT, TEXINFINE S.A., , FR | Effective DATE: | 20150413 | | Event date: | 21.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602007009133 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | BOHMANN, DE | Effective DATE: | 20150413 | | Event date: | 21.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602007009133 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | GRIMAUD, JEAN ALEXIS, FR | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: GIRMAUD, JEAN ALEXIS, PARIS, FR; INNOVAT, TUNIS, TN; TEXINFINE S.A., LYON, FR | Effective DATE: | 20150413 | | Event date: | 21.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602007009133 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | INNOVAT, TN | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: GIRMAUD, JEAN ALEXIS, PARIS, FR; INNOVAT, TUNIS, TN; TEXINFINE S.A., LYON, FR | Effective DATE: | 20150413 | | Event date: | 21.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602007009133 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | ICP-TEXINFINE, FR | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: GIRMAUD, JEAN ALEXIS, PARIS, FR; INNOVAT, TUNIS, TN; TEXINFINE S.A., LYON, FR | Effective DATE: | 20150413 | | Event date: | 22.01.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 24.01.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 23.01.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 21.02.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602007009133 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | BOHMANN, DE | | Event date: | 21.02.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602007009133 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | MATRISCIENCE S.A., FR | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: GRIMAUD, JEAN ALEXIS, PARIS, FR; ICP-TEXINFINE, LYON, FR; INNOVAT, TUNIS, TN | | Event date: | 03.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20190307 AND 20190313 | | Event date: | 06.08.2010 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 30.06.2010 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 23.03.2010 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 16.03.2010 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 16.03.2010 | | Event description: | INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1 | | Event date: | 04.12.2009 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 15.07.2011 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 15.07.2011 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 12.07.2023 | | Event description: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230527 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20240103 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20240108 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20240127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | |