EP1991500 - PRODUCTION OF SOLAR AND ELECTRONIC GRADE SILICON FROM ALUMINOSILICATE CONTAINING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 19.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyattville Company Ltd. Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUFMAN, Tsvi Kfar Vradim / IL | 02 /
MEYEROVICH, Evgeny Beni Ayash / IL | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | van Heuvel, Margaretha, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | van Heuvel, Margaretha, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 07705914.5 | 20.02.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007IB50535 | Priority number, date | EP20060110176 | 20.02.2006 Original published format: EP 06110176 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007116326 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1991500 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/02, C01B33/025, C01B33/12, C01B33/187, C01B33/193, C01F7/22, C01F7/30 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
C01B33/26 (EP);
B01J19/088 (EP);
B01J8/0055 (EP);
C01B33/02 (EP);
C01B33/025 (EP);
C01B33/12 (EP);
C01B33/126 (EP);
C01B33/187 (EP);
C01F11/24 (EP);
C01F7/22 (EP);
C01F7/306 (EP);
B01J2219/00094 (EP);
B01J2219/0883 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON SILICIUM MIT SOLAR- UND ELEKTRONIKQUALITÄT AUS ALUMINOSILIKATHALTIGEM MATERIAL | [2008/47] | English: | PRODUCTION OF SOLAR AND ELECTRONIC GRADE SILICON FROM ALUMINOSILICATE CONTAINING MATERIAL | [2008/47] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE SILICIUM DE QUALITÉ SOLAIRE ET ÉLÉCTRONIQUE À PARTIR DE MATÉRIAUX CONTENANT DES ALUMINOSILICATES | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 10.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/12] | 18.02.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.09.2010 | 29.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3116973 (HADEN JR WALTER L) [A] 5-12 * column 1, lines 10-12 * * column 2, lines 15-30 * * column 2, lines 45-67 *; | [YA]DE1667815 (ELEUSIS BAUXITE MINES INC) [Y] 1,5-8,10,12 * claim 1 * [A] 9,11; | [YA]EP0243880 (DOW CORNING [US]) [Y] 1 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 15 * [A] 2-4; | [A]EP0357395 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] * page 2, lines 33-63 *; | [DYA]US5993758 (NEHARI SHLOMO [IL], et al) [DY] 1,5-8,10,12 * the whole document * [A] 9,11; | [A]US6409978 (FAULKNER BOBBY P [US], et al) [A] 5-12 * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, lines 18-48 * * column 5, lines 3-13 *; | [A]US2005129628 (STANIER PETER W [GB], et al) [A] * the whole document * |