EP1982024 - A PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kingspan Research and Developments Limited Dublin Road Kingscourt, County Cavan / IE | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLYNN, Gregory Teach Mhuilinn Rathdaniel Collon County Louth / IE | 02 /
CAROLAN, James Drumpeak Kingscourt County Cavan / IE | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2008/43] | O'Brien, John Augustine, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Third Floor, Duncairn House, 14 Carysfort Avenue Blackrock, Co Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 07706000.2 | 12.02.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007IE00018 | Priority number, date | IE20060000095 | 10.02.2006 Original published format: IE 20060095 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007091233 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1982024 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08, E04C2/292 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
E04C2/292 (EP,GB,US);
E04C2/526 (GB);
E04D3/352 (EP,US);
E04D3/355 (EP,US);
E04D3/38 (GB);
E04F13/042 (EP,US);
E04F13/0876 (EP,GB,US);
E04F13/0889 (EP,GB,US);
E04F21/12 (EP,US);
E04F2201/07 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Extension states | AL | 29.07.2008 | BA | 29.07.2008 | HR | 29.07.2008 | MK | 29.07.2008 | RS | 29.07.2008 | Title | German: | PLATTE | [2008/43] | English: | A PANEL | [2008/43] | French: | PANNEAU | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 16.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 22.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3292330 (TENNISON ARTHUR R); | [I]DE8108886U ; | [A]GB2121081 (STOTMEISTER GMBH); | [I]DE8803615U ; | [A]DE9011083U ; | [A]DE19706804 (SAAR GUMMIWERK GMBH [DE]); | [I]DE29715659U (ILLBRUCK BAU TECHNIK GMBH & CO [DE]); | [I]DE20108555U (THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG [DE]); | [I]EP1533442 (BRITISH ROBERTSON S L U [ES]) |