EP1971252 - OVER-TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKKAICHI, Takayasu c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
MATSUNO, Kiyotaka c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 03 /
NAKAHASHI, Kensei c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 04 /
KAJI, Kunihide c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2018/24] |
Former [2016/46] | 01 /
MIKKAICHI, Takayasu OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUNO, Kiyotaka OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAHASHI, Kensei OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | |||
04 /
KAJI, Kunihide OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | |||
Former [2008/39] | 01 /
MIKKAICHI, Takayasu, OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 1510072 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUNO, Kiyotaka, OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 1510072 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAHASHI, Kensei, OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 1510072 / JP | |||
04 /
KAJI, Kunihide, OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 1510072 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [2018/24] |
Former [2008/39] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07706927.6 | 11.01.2007 | [2008/39] | WO2007JP50620 | Priority number, date | US20060331976 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: US 331976 | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007081041 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1971252 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1971252 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61M16/04, A61B1/015 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
A61B1/273 (EP,US);
A61B1/00082 (EP,US);
A61B1/00154 (EP,US);
A61B1/015 (EP,US);
A61M16/04 (EP,US);
A61M16/0415 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/39] | A61B1/00, A61M16/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2018/24] |
Former [2009/08] | DE, FR, GB, IE | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ÜBERROHR | [2008/39] | English: | OVER-TUBE | [2008/39] | French: | TUBE DE GUIDAGE | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 14.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 11.01.2019 | IE | 11.01.2019 | FR | 31.01.2019 | [2020/09] |
Former [2020/03] | GB | 11.01.2019 | |
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | FR | 31.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1505607 (VUILLARD PAUL) [X] 1-4,6,8 * page 3, column 1, line 10 - page 4, column 1, line 8; figures 4-7 *; | [Y]US5499625 (FRASS MICHAEL [AT], et al) [Y] 7 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 58 ** column 6, line 27 - line 42; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US6895966 (CHRISTOPHER KENT L [US]) [X] 1,5,8 * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 10 * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 13 * * column 8, line 9 - column 10, line 7; figures 1-4,8-17 * [Y] 7 | International search | [A]JPS63230162 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JPH059556U ; | [A]JPH05269204 |