EP1973115 - CONTENTS REPRODUCER AND REPRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMORI, Akihiro C/O SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
TAKATSUKA, Susumu C/O SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
SASAKI, Toru C/O SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 04 /
SAKAI, Yuichi C/O SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 05 /
SAKO, Yoichiro C/O SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 06 /
TERAUCHI, Toshiro C/O SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 07 /
TAMORI, Hirofumi C/O SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 08 /
INOUE, Makoto C/O SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 09 /
SHIRAI, Katsuya C/O SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 10 /
TAKAI, Motoyuki C/O SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 11 /
MAKINO, Kenichi C/O SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 12 /
NAKAMURA, Takatoshi C/O SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 13 /
SANO, Akane C/O SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich & Partner Patent-und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07706943.3 | 11.01.2007 | [2008/39] | WO2007JP50636 | Priority number, date | JP20060005022 | 12.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006005022 | [2008/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007081051 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1973115 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B20/10, G10H1/00, A63B71/06 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
A63B71/0686 (EP,US);
G10H1/00 (KR);
G10H1/40 (EP,US);
A63B2024/0071 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0625 (EP,US);
A63B2220/30 (EP,US);
A63B2220/36 (EP,US);
A63B2225/50 (EP,US);
G10H2210/385 (EP,US);
G10H2240/131 (EP,US);
G11B2220/61 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/39] | G11B27/10, G11B20/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/10] |
Former [2008/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHALTSWIEDERGABEVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2008/39] | English: | CONTENTS REPRODUCER AND REPRODUCTION METHOD | [2008/39] | French: | REPRODUCTEUR DE CONTENU ET PROCEDE DE REPRODUCTION | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2008 | Translation filed | 11.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 04.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/06] | 13.09.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001299980 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [I]WO03094148 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [I] 1-6 * page 10 - page 13 *; | [A]WO2005082472 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [I] - WIJNALDA G ET AL, "A PERSONALIZED MUSIC SYSTEM FOR MOTIVATION IN SPORT PERFORMANCE", IEEE PERVASIVE COMPUTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20050701), vol. 4, no. 3, doi:10.1109/MPRV.2005.47, ISSN 1536-1268, pages 26 - 32, XP002393734 [I] 1-6 * page 30 - page 31 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MPRV.2005.47 | International search | [A]JPH1063265 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JP2004113552 (CLARION CO LTD); | [A]JP2005274790 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2003085888 | JP2005156641 |