EP2107029 - ELEVATOR APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | 05.03.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIGAWA, Hiroshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
MARUYAMA, Naoyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
SHIBATA, Masunori c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
ANDO, Eiji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07707216.3 | 23.01.2007 | [2009/41] | WO2007JP50953 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008090601 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2107029 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/32, B66B5/02, B66B5/04, B66B5/18 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
B66B1/32 (EP,KR);
B66B5/02 (EP,KR);
B66B5/027 (EP);
B66B5/044 (EP);
B66B5/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/41] | B66B1/32, B66B5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/41] | Title | German: | AUFZUGSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/41] | English: | ELEVATOR APPARATUS | [2009/41] | French: | APPAREIL ASCENSEUR | [2009/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2009 | Translation filed | 03.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/41] | 06.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0121522 (KONE CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,5 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 5, lines 12-22 * * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 9, line 22 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XI]EP1604935 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0010] - [0018] - [0023] , [0025] - [0028] - [0033] , [0041] - [0044] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 2,3; | [D]WO2004083091 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2006306517 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 4 * paragraphs [0011] - [0019] - [0025] , [0026] * * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]US2006180406 (GREMAUD NICOLAS [CH], et al) [A] 6,7 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0023] - [0029] - [0034] , [0041] , [0042] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0739852 (WESSEX MEDICAL EQUIPMENT COMPA [GB]) [A] 1 * column 5, lines 10-18 * * column 8, line 9 - column 9, line 45 * * column 11, line 50 - column 13, line 44 * * figures 1,2,14,14A,19,20,21 * | International search | [X]WO2004083091 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2006306517 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2006347771 (INVENTIO AG) |