EP1983518 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PICK-UP DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMONO, Hiroshi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 KONAN MINATO-KU Tokyo 1080075 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Ryogo c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 KONAN MINATO-KU Tokyo 1080075 / JP | 03 /
YOKOTA, Junichi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 KONAN MINATO-KU Tokyo 1080075 / JP | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07707977.0 | 02.02.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007JP51828 | Priority number, date | JP20060027946 | 06.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006027946 | [2008/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007091497 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1983518 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11B19/04, H04N5/76, H04N5/765, H04N5/781 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
G11B19/042 (EP,US);
G11B19/04 (KR);
G11B19/043 (EP,US);
G11B19/044 (EP,US);
G11B19/046 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B33/144 (EP,US);
G11B33/1453 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (KR);
H04N5/772 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/10] |
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSGERÄT, BILDAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2008/43] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PICK-UP DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2008/43] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE L'INFORMATION, DISPOSITIF DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE, MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE L'INFORMATION ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2008 | Translation filed | 15.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 08.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005235167 (TIOTANTRA HARRY [SG], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005213242 (FUJIKI MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5737481 (GUSHIMA TOYOJI [JP], et al); | [A]US5857059 (YAMAGISHI YOICHI [JP]); | [A]JP3173942B |