EP1985939 - AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTANI, Takuya c/o Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1304, Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 02 /
HORI, Kikuji c/o Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1304, Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 03 /
MATSUOKA, Shinya c/o Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1304, Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | [2018/04] |
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
KOTANI, Takuya c/o Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1304, Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | ||
02 /
HORI, Kikuji c/o Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1304, Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUOKA, Shinya c/o Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1304, Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/04] |
Former [2008/44] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07708353.3 | 13.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007JP52462 | Priority number, date | JP20060041213 | 17.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006041213 | [2008/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007094285 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1985939 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1985939 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00, F25B49/02 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
F25B49/025 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/86 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/62 (KR);
F24F11/83 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/84 (EP,KR,US);
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
F25B2313/0253 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2313/02743 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2400/061 (KR);
F25B2400/0751 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2500/26 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2600/01 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/11] | F24F11/02, F25B1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/44] | F24F11/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/04] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE | [2008/44] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER | [2008/44] | French: | CLIMATISEUR | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2008 | Translation filed | 19.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 10.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2007 | AT | 24.01.2018 | CY | 24.01.2018 | CZ | 24.01.2018 | DK | 24.01.2018 | EE | 24.01.2018 | FI | 24.01.2018 | LT | 24.01.2018 | LV | 24.01.2018 | MC | 24.01.2018 | NL | 24.01.2018 | PL | 24.01.2018 | PT | 24.01.2018 | RO | 24.01.2018 | SE | 24.01.2018 | SI | 24.01.2018 | SK | 24.01.2018 | IE | 13.02.2018 | LU | 13.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | BG | 24.04.2018 | GR | 25.04.2018 | IS | 24.05.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2019/12] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.02.2018 | ||
LU | 13.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.02.2018 | ||
LU | 13.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 24.01.2018 | |
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4384462 (OVERMAN JOSEPH, et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [X]JPS6325457 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,3,6 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH01262387 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH01262386 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [XI]JPH0227176 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [I] 2-5; | [I]JPH05157374 (TOSHIBA CORP) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH10220884 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1,3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2001324231 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH1114123 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JP2004101012 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD); | [Y]JP2004205143 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) | Examination | WO03073025 | WO2004109192 |