Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8522535 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2013 | B2 | US2011209464 | 01.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP52679 | 15.02.2007 | US201113102996 | 06.05.2011 | JP2006098568 | 31.03.2006 | US24084308 | 29.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7958905 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2011 | B2 | US2009019840 | 22.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006098568 | 31.03.2006 | WO2007JP52679 | 15.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2006502 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2012 | B1 | EP2006502 | 27.01.2010 | A4 | EP2006502 | 08.07.2009 | A9 | EP2006502 | 24.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2006098568 | 31.03.2006 | WO2007JP52679 | 15.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101410599B | 03.10.2012 | B | CN101410599 | 15.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006098568 | 31.03.2006 | WO2007JP52679 | 15.02.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007125665 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006098568 | 31.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4845012B | Global Dossier | 28.12.2011 | B2 | JP2007270744 | 18.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006098568 | 31.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102787886B | 05.11.2014 | B | CN102787886 | 21.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006098568 | 31.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102865126B | 21.01.2015 | B | CN102865126 | 09.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006098568 | 31.03.2006 |