EP1982324 - A VOICE DETECTOR AND A METHOD FOR SUPPRESSING SUB-BANDS IN A VOICE DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2014/39] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L- M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEHLSTEDT, Martin Snövägen 439B S-976 33 Luleå / SE | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Egrelius, Fredrik, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista Device, Service & Media Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/43] | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07709334.2 | 09.02.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007SE00118 | Priority number, date | US20060743276P | 10.02.2006 Original published format: US 743276 P | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007091956 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1982324 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1982324 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G10L25/78, G10L19/02, G10L21/0208, // G10L21/0232 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
G10L21/0208 (EP,US);
G10L19/012 (US);
G10L19/0204 (EP,US);
G10L25/78 (EP,US);
G10L21/0232 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/43] | G10L11/02, G06F17/14, G10L19/00, G10L21/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STIMMENDETEKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON SUBBÄNDERN IN EINEM STIMMENDETEKTOR | [2008/43] | English: | A VOICE DETECTOR AND A METHOD FOR SUPPRESSING SUB-BANDS IN A VOICE DETECTOR | [2008/43] | French: | DETECTEUR VOCAL ET PROCEDE DE SUPPRESSION DE SOUS-BANDES DANS UN DETECTEUR VOCAL | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 19.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 16.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2007 | AT | 24.09.2014 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | DK | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | FI | 24.09.2014 | IT | 24.09.2014 | LT | 24.09.2014 | LV | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | PL | 24.09.2014 | RO | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | IS | 24.01.2015 | PT | 26.01.2015 | IE | 09.02.2015 | LU | 09.02.2015 | BE | 28.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 24.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - JELINEK M ET AL, "Advances in Source-controlled variable bit rate wideband speech coding", SPECIAL WORKSHOP IN MAUI (SWIM): LECTURES BY MASTERS IN SPEECHPROCESSING, XX, XX, (20040112), pages 1 - 8, XP002272510 [A] 1-24 * page 22 - page 25 * | [A] - CORNU E ET AL, "Etsi amr-2 vad: evaluation and ultra low resource implementation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2003 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO: 6 - 9 JULY 2003, BALTIMORE MARRIOTT WATERFRONT HOTEL, BALTIMORE, MARYLAND, USA, IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, US, (20030706), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-7965-7, pages 841 - 844, XP010650552 [A] 1-24 * pages II-842, column r, paragraph 2 - pages II-843, column r, paragraph 1 * | [T] - Andreas Ekeroth, "Improvements of the voice activity detector in AMR-WB", ISSN 1402-1617, (20071121), Lulea University of Technology, URL: http://epubl.ltu.se/1402-1617/2007/262/LTU-EX-07262-SE.pdf, (20111212), XP002665632 [T] * page 22 - page 25 * | [IP] - LI YE ET AL, "Voice Activity Detection in Non-stationary Noise", COMPUTATIONAL ENGINEERING IN SYSTEMS APPLICATIONS, IMACS MULTICONFEREN CE ON, IEEE, PI, (20061001), doi:10.1109/CESA.2006.4281886, ISBN 978-7-302-13922-5, pages 1573 - 1575, XP031121496 [IP] 1,17,19,21 * page 1573, column l, paragraph 3 - page 1575, column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CESA.2006.4281886 | [XPI] - DAVIS A ET AL, "A multi-decision sub-band voice activity detector", (20060906), pages 1 - 5, 14TH EUROPEAN SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE (EUSIPCO 2006), FLORENCE, ITALY, SEPTEMBER 4-8, 2006,, URL: http://www.eurasip.org/proceedings/eusipco/eusipco2006/papers/1568981 496.pdf, (20111212), XP002559305 [XP] 1,17 * page 2, column l, paragraph 3 - page 3, column r, paragraph 5 * [I] 19 | International search | [Y]US6023674 (MEKURIA FISSEHA [SE]); | [A]US2002041678 (BASBURG-ERTEM FILIZ [US], et al); | [X] - DAVIS A. ET AL., "A Low Complexity Statistical Voice Activity Detector with Performance Comparisons to ITU-T/ETSI Voice Activity Detectors", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2003 JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION, COMMUNICATIONS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2003 AND THE FOURTH PACIFIC RIM CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA, (20031215), vol. 1, pages 119 - 123, XP010701229 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICICS.2003.1292425 | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Mandatory speech codec speech processing functions; Adaptive Multi-Rate (AMR) speech codec; Voice Activity Detector (VAD) (Release 6)", ARIB STD-T63-26.094 V6.0.0 (3GPP TS 26.094 V6.0.0), (200412), pages 12 - 13, XP003016210 | by applicant | US5276765 | US5410632 | US5742734 | US5749067 | US5963901 | - "Adaptive Multi-Rate (AMR) speech codec; Voice Activity Detector (VAD", 3GPP TS 26.094, (200412), vol. 600 | - "Enhanced Variable Rate Codec, Speech Service Option 3 for Wideband Spread Spectrum Digital Systems", 3GPP2, C.S0014-A, (200405), vol. 10 | - "Adaptive Multi-Rate (AMR) speech codec; Comfort Noise AMR Speech Traffic Channels", 3GPP TS 26.094, (200412), vol. 600 | - "Adaptive Multi-Rate (AMR) speech codec; Source Control Rate Operation", 3GPP TS 26.093, (200606), vol. 610 |