EP1991824 - METHOD FOR FORMING A SURFACE LAYER ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/47] | POROUS LAYER | ||
[2019/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danfoss A/S Nordborgvej 81 6430 Nordborg / DK | [2020/09] |
Former [2019/45] | For all designated states Micro Delta T AB Garnviksägen 12 184 42 Akersberga / SE | ||
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Micro Delta T AB Garnviksägen 12 184 42 Akersberga / SE | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Furberg, Richard Virebergsvägen 169 31 Solna / SE | ||
For all designated states Palm, Björn Tomtebergavägen 10 141 43 Huddinge / SE | |||
For all designated states Li, Shanghua Armégatan 32/0015 17171 Solna / SE | |||
For all designated states Muhammed, Mamoun Eketorpsvägen 25 182 61 Djursholm / SE | |||
For all designated states Toprak, Muhammet 7170 Davenport Road Apt. 108 Goleta CA 93117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURBERG, Richard Garnviksvägen 12 184 42 Åkersberga / SE | 02 /
PALM, Björn Tomtebergavägen 10 141 43 Huddinge / SE | 03 /
LI, Shanghua Murtegelvägen 11A 723 48 Västeras / SE | 04 /
MUHAMMED, Mamoun Eketorpsvägen 25 182 61 Djursholm / SE | 05 /
TOPRAK, Muhammet Kastrupgatan 6, 3 tr 164 41 Kista / SE | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/24] | 01 /
FURBERG, Richard Garnviksvägen 12 184 42 Åkersberga / SE | ||
02 /
PALM, Björn Tomtebergavägen 10 141 43 Huddinge / SE | |||
03 /
LI, Shanghua Fridensborgsvägen 27 170 69 Solna / SE | |||
04 /
MUHAMMED, Mamoun Eketorpsvägen 25 182 61 Djursholm / SE | |||
05 /
TOPRAK, Muhammet Kastrupgatan 6, 3 tr 164 41 Kista / SE | |||
Former [2008/47] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Drottninggatan 27 103 59 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/46] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/47] | Franks, Barry Gerard BRANN AB Uppsala Office Box 171 92 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07709401.9 | 02.03.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007SE00208 | Priority number, date | SE20060000475 | 03.03.2006 Original published format: SE 0600475 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007100297 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1991824 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1991824 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F28F13/18, C25D5/00, C25D5/48, C23C14/16, C23C16/06 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
F28F13/187 (EP,US);
C25D5/003 (EP,US);
C25D5/50 (EP,US);
C25D5/605 (EP,US);
C25D5/617 (EP,US);
C25D5/623 (EP,US);
C25D7/00 (EP,US);
F28F2255/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OBERFLÄCHENSCHICHT AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT | [2019/02] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING A SURFACE LAYER ON A SUBSTRATE | [2019/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR REALISER UNE COUCHE SUPERFICIELLE SUR UN SUBSTRAT | [2019/02] |
Former [2008/47] | PORÖSE SCHICHT | ||
Former [2008/47] | POROUS LAYER | ||
Former [2008/47] | COUCHE POREUSE | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 01.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2012 | 31.03.2013 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.2013 | 31.03.2016 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2016 | 31.03.2018 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2018 | 31.03.2019 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.03.2007 | AT | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | ES | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | NL | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | SE | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | BG | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | IE | 02.03.2020 | LU | 02.03.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IE | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 02.03.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IE | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 02.03.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IE | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 02.03.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AT | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
LU | 02.03.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AT | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 06.11.2019 | |
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 06.11.2019 | |
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 06.11.2019 | |
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3298936 (MICHAEL HAROLD J) [Y] 10-13 * abstract *; | [Y]US4120994 (INOUE KIYOSHI) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, lines 18-25 * * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 33 * * column 3, line 20 - line 68 *; | [A]EP0226861 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2004256236 (MINEVSKI ZORAN [US], et al) [Y] 7-9 * paragraphs [0019] , [0024] , [0038] - [0072]; figure - *; | [YD] - H.-C. SHIN ET AL, "Nanoporous Structures Prepared by an Electrochemical Deposition Process", ADVANCED MATERIALS, vol. 15, no. 19, doi:10.1002/adma.200305160, ISSN 0935-9648, (20031002), pages 1610 - 1614, (20130905), XP055077693 [YD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.200305160 | [Y] - SHANGHUA LI L ET AL, "Nanostructured Surfaces for Boiling Enhancement.", NANOPOROUS AND NANOSTRUCTURED MATERIALS FOR CATALYSIS, SENSOR, AND GAS SEPARATION APPLICATIONS, (20050401), page 419, URL: http://www.mrs.org/s05-abstract-r/, (20130905), XP055077857 [Y] 1-15 * page 419 * | International search | [A]US3884772 (SHIGA SHOJI); | [X]US4258783 (ALBERTSON CLARENCE E, et al); | [X]US4381818 (SACHAR KENNETH S, et al); | [X]EP0224761 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP]); | [X]WO0238827 (CHANG CHAK MAN THOMAS [AU], et al); | [X] - DONCHENKO M.I. ET AL., "Role of Surface-Active Additives at Obtaining of Highly-Porous Coatings", GAL'VANOTECHNIKA I OBRABOTKA POVERCHNOSTI, (1996), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 18 - 22, XP003013933 | [A] - SCHULZ A., "Mikrostrukturierte Wärmetauscherrohre", KL LUFT- UND KOLTETECHNIK, (2004), vol. 40, no. 6, pages 218 - 221, XP003013934 | Examination | WO2005006395 | by applicant | US3384154 | US3523577 | US3587730 | US4216826 | US4780373 | JP2002228389 | - SHIN et al., Adv. Mater., (20030000), vol. 15, pages 1610 - 1614 | - Chem. Mater., (20040000), vol. 16, pages 5460 - 5464 | - "Describing Uncertainties in Sin gle Sample Experiments", Mechanical Engineering, (19530000), vol. 75, pages 3 - 8 | - INCROPERA; DEWITT, Fundamentals of Heat and Mass Transfer, Wiley, pages 545 - 551 | - STOCKHOLM; SHIN et al., "Nanoporous Structures Prepared by an Electrochemical Deposition Process", Advanced Materials, vol. 15, no. 19, doi:doi:10.1002/adma.200305160, pages 1610 - 1614, XP055077693 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.200305160 | - XIAO et al., "Tuning the Architecture of Mesostructures by Electrodeposition", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20040000), vol. 126, doi:doi:10.1021/ja0315154, pages 2316 - 2317, XP055077704 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0315154 | - "Heat Flow Rates in Saturated Nucleate Pool Boiling - A Wide Ranging Examination Using Reduced Properties", COOPER, Advances in Heat Transfer, Academic Press, pages 203 - 205 |