EP1987659 - INTEGRATION OF ENTERPRISE VOICEMAIL IN MOBILE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2016/30] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states Orative Corporation One Almadeb Boulevard, Suite 300 San Jose, CA 95113-2246 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHATTERJEE, Saurav 125 S. Market Street Suite 500 San Jose, CA 95113-2281 / US | 02 /
DREWRY, John 215 Sunkist Lane Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 03 /
FULLARTON, Paul 771 Alder Dr. Bldg. 21-3 Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 04 /
PERFETTO, Josh 125 S. Market Street Suite 500 San Jose, CA 95113-2281 / US | 05 /
RANA, Hemendra Mail Stop SJC21/3/3 771 Alder Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2008/51] |
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
CHATTERJEE, Saurav 125 S. Market Street Suite 500 San Jose, CA 95113-2281 / US | ||
02 /
DREWRY, John 125 S. Market Street Suite 500 San Jose, CA 95113-2281 / US | |||
03 /
FULLARTON, Paul 125 S. Market Street Suite 500 San Jose, CA 95113-2281 / US | |||
04 /
PERFETTO, Josh 125 S. Market Street Suite 500 San Jose, CA 95113-2281 / US | |||
05 /
RANA, Hemendra 125 S. Market Street Suite 500 San Jose, CA 95113-2281 / US | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07709640.2 | 08.01.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007US00487 | Priority number, date | US20060756686P | 06.01.2006 Original published format: US 756686 P | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007081929 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1987659 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/12, H04M3/533, H04L29/08, H04M1/725 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
H04M3/53333 (EP);
H04L67/1095 (EP);
H04M1/72433 (EP);
H04W4/12 (EP);
H04M2203/253 (EP);
H04M2203/256 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | H04M3/533, H04L29/08, H04M1/725 | ||
Former IPC [2008/45] | H04M3/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Title | German: | INTEGRATION VON UNTERNEHMENS-VOICEMAIL IN MOBILE SYSTEME | [2008/45] | English: | INTEGRATION OF ENTERPRISE VOICEMAIL IN MOBILE SYSTEMS | [2008/45] | French: | INTÉGRATION D'UNE MESSAGERIE VOCALE D'ENTREPRISE DANS DES SYSTÈMES MOBILES | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 17.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/34] | 16.07.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.07.2019 | 18.07.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03085946 (GOOD TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-57* the whole document *; | [X]US2005186945 (MAZOR GADI [IL]) [X] 1-57 * paragraphs [0035] - [0088] * | International search | [A]US6345288 (REED DRUMMOND SHATTUCK [US], et al); | [A]US6424711 (BAYLESS JEANNE A [US], et al); | [A]US6754181 (ELLIOTT ISAAC K [US], et al); | [A]US2005041647 (STINNIE DESMOND L [US]); | [X]US2005088890 (MATSUNAGA YASUHIKO [JP], et al) | Examination | US6792085 | - Anonymous, "To Set the Automatic Message Removal (Expire and Purge) Feature (Sun Java System Messaging Server 6 2005Q4 Administration Guide)", (20050101), URL: https://docs.oracle.com/cd/E19636-01/819-2650/bgaxc/index.html, (20190627), XP055600205 | by applicant | WO03085946 | US2005186945 |