EP1969898 - PORTABLE SPEAKER DEVICE AND PORTABLE AUDIO DEVICE PLAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coby Electronics Corporation 56-65 Rust Street Maspeth NY 11378 / US | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yongde 10/4d, City Pearl Garden, Long Hua Shen Zhen, Guang Dong / CN | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07709929.9 | 03.01.2007 | [2008/38] | WO2007US60051 | Priority number, date | US20060755766P | 04.01.2006 Original published format: US 755766 P | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007079478 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1969898 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1969898 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/02, // H04R5/02 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
H04R1/025 (EP,US);
H04R2205/021 (EP,US);
H04R5/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/46] | H04R1/02 | ||
Former IPC [2008/38] | H04R9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE LAUTSPRECHERVORRICHTUNG UND TRAGBARES AUDIOABSPIELGERÄT | [2008/38] | English: | PORTABLE SPEAKER DEVICE AND PORTABLE AUDIO DEVICE PLAYER | [2008/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTATIF A HAUT-PARLEURS ET LECTEUR DE DISPOSITIF AUDIO PORTATIF | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 18.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.01.2007 | AT | 14.09.2011 | BE | 14.09.2011 | CY | 14.09.2011 | CZ | 14.09.2011 | DK | 14.09.2011 | EE | 14.09.2011 | FI | 14.09.2011 | IT | 14.09.2011 | LT | 14.09.2011 | LV | 14.09.2011 | PL | 14.09.2011 | RO | 14.09.2011 | SE | 14.09.2011 | SI | 14.09.2011 | SK | 14.09.2011 | TR | 14.09.2011 | BG | 14.12.2011 | GR | 15.12.2011 | ES | 25.12.2011 | IE | 03.01.2012 | LU | 03.01.2012 | IS | 14.01.2012 | PT | 16.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IE | 03.01.2012 | ||
LU | 03.01.2012 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IE | 03.01.2012 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IE | 03.01.2012 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IE | 03.01.2012 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IE | 03.01.2012 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 14.09.2011 | |
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 14.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB615481 (PHILIPS NV) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2005265569 (LANGBERG ERIC A [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-7b *; | [PX]GB2425231 (INVENTEC MULTIMEDIA & TELECOM [TW]) [PX] 1* figures 1a,1b *; | [PX]WO2006130114 (CREATIVE TECH LTD [SG], et al) [PX] 1 * figures 1-6 * | International search | [Y]US6151401 (ANNARATONE MARCO [US]); | [X]US2005244025 (SCHUL ERAN [US], et al); | [A]US6968068 (AMSEL ALLAN [US]) |