EP1982136 - VALVE ASSEMBLY FOR PAINTBALL GUNS AND THE LIKE, AND IMPROVED GUNS INCORPORATING THE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Long, Robert, M. 1799 Carpenter Road Oakley CA 94561 / US | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Exell, Jonathan Mark Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Exell, Jonathan Mark Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07710342.2 | 26.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007US61164 | Priority number, date | US20060762969P | 26.01.2006 Original published format: US 762969 P | US20060552131 | 23.10.2006 Original published format: US 552131 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007087634 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1982136 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F41B11/32 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
F41B11/721 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/43] | F41B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Title | German: | VENTILANORDNUNG FÜR PAINTBALL-GEWEHRE UND DERGLEICHEN SOWIE DIE ANORDNUNG ENTHALTENDE VERBESSERTE GEWEHRE | [2008/43] | English: | VALVE ASSEMBLY FOR PAINTBALL GUNS AND THE LIKE, AND IMPROVED GUNS INCORPORATING THE ASSEMBLY | [2008/43] | French: | VALVE ASSEMBLY FOR PAINTBALL GUNS AND THE LIKE, AND IMPROVED GUNS INCORPORATING THE ASSEMBLY | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 27.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/14] | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9900635 (BRASS EAGLE INC [US], et al) [A] 1,9,15 | International search | [E]US7299796 (KIRWAN LEE [CA]); | [A]US2005115554 (JONES DANIAL S [US]); | [A]US2006011186 (JONES DANIAL [US], et al); | [A]US5613483 (LUKAS MICHAEL A [CA], et al); | [A]US6626165 (BHOGAL KALVINDER SINGH [CA]) |