EP1991450 - CAMERA ARRANGMENT FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG Wiesenstrasse 47 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLÄSING, Frank Kurze Strasse 15 59457 Werl / DE | 02 /
BÖBEL, Ralf Friedhofstrasse 15 59439 Holzwickede / DE | 03 /
BÖHNE, Gregor Ringstr. 49d 44575 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | 04 /
RICHWIN, Matthias Edelrautenweg 10 44289 Dortmund / DE | 05 /
WEBER, Thomas Schulstr. 70 58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/47] | 01 /
BLÄSING, Frank Kurze Strasse 15 59457 Werl / DE | ||
02 /
BÖBEL, Ralf Friedhofstrasse 15 59439 Holzwickede / DE | |||
03 /
BÖHNE, Gregor Ringstr. 49d 44575 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | |||
04 /
RICHWIN, Matthias Am Knappenberg 43 44139 Dortmund / DE | |||
05 /
WEBER, Thomas Schulstr. 70 58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 07711806.5 | 06.03.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007EP01899 | Priority number, date | DE20061010671 | 08.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006010671 | [2008/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007101651 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1991450 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1991450 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/08, B60R11/04 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
B60R11/04 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0003 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0026 (EP,US);
B60S1/0844 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAMERAANORDNUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2008/47] | English: | CAMERA ARRANGMENT FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2008/47] | French: | ENSEMBLE CAMÉRA POUR VÉHICULE À MOTEUR | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 29.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 21.04.2010 | DK | 21.04.2010 | EE | 21.04.2010 | FI | 21.04.2010 | HU | 21.04.2010 | IE | 21.04.2010 | LT | 21.04.2010 | LV | 21.04.2010 | MT | 21.04.2010 | NL | 21.04.2010 | PL | 21.04.2010 | RO | 21.04.2010 | SE | 21.04.2010 | SI | 21.04.2010 | SK | 21.04.2010 | TR | 21.04.2010 | CY | 02.06.2010 | BG | 21.07.2010 | GR | 22.07.2010 | IS | 21.08.2010 | PT | 23.08.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CZ | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
MT | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
TR | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 21.07.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CZ | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
MT | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 21.07.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
MT | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 21.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004200948 (BOS BRENT J [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049]; figure 2b *; | [A]EP1536204 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE10355205 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032]; figure 3 *; | [DA]DE102004015040 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1 * paragraph [0034]; figure 1 * |