04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
13.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] |
30.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
03.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
27.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
20.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
11.03.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] |
08.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
02.04.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
23.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.02.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.10.2009 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
20.10.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.06.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.11.2008 |
First examination report |
|
27.11.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.09.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
05.09.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
05.07.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|