Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1977112 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2010 | B1 | EP1977112 | 08.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006011613 | 14.03.2006 | WO2007EP02178 | 13.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE467051T | 15.05.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006011613 | 14.03.2006 | WO2007EP02178 | 13.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502007003649D1 | 17.06.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006011613 | 14.03.2006 | WO2007EP02178 | 13.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007104526 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006011613 | 14.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR059835 | 30.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006011613 | 14.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006011613 | 20.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006011613 | 14.03.2006 |