EP1977112 - CENTRIFUGAL PUMP HAVING AN AXIAL THRUST BALANCING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DWARS, Anja Makarenkostrasse 22 90471 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
KASTRUP, Norbert Richard-Wagner-Strasse 39 95444 Bayreuth / DE | [2008/41] | Application number, filing date | 07711923.8 | 13.03.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007EP02178 | Priority number, date | DE20061011613 | 14.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006011613 | [2008/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007104526 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977112 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977112 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/04, F04D29/16 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
F04D29/167 (EP);
F04D29/0413 (EP);
F04D29/0416 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREISELPUMPE MIT AXIALSCHUBAUSGLEICHSEINRICHTUNG | [2008/41] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL PUMP HAVING AN AXIAL THRUST BALANCING DEVICE | [2008/41] | French: | POMPE CENTRIFUGE A DISPOSITIF DE COMPENSATION DE LA POUSSEE AXIALE | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 01.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | HU | 05.05.2010 | IE | 05.05.2010 | LT | 05.05.2010 | LV | 05.05.2010 | MT | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | PL | 05.05.2010 | RO | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | CY | 02.06.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | ES | 16.08.2010 | IS | 05.09.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CZ | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
MT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CZ | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
MT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
MT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2075029 (SWEARINGEN JUDSON S [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1250062 (ALLWEILER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0121053 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19631824 (KLEIN SCHANZLIN & BECKER AG [DE]) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5980114 (OKLEJAS JR ELI [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |