EP2005051 - SYSTEM FOR DYNAMICALLY SEALING A CONDUIT SLEEVE THROUGH WHICH A PIPE OR CABLE EXTENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beele Engineering B.V. Beunkdijk 11 7122 NZ Aalten / NL | [2024/17] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Beele Engineering B.V. Beunkdijk 11 7122 NZ Aalten / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEELE, Johannes Alfred Beunkdijk 11 NL-7122 NZ Aalten / NL | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | van Bouwelen, Franciscus Maria Hoffmann Eitle B.V. Weerdestein 97 1083 GG Amsterdam / NL | [2024/17] |
Former [2008/52] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07711984.0 | 20.03.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007EP02478 | Priority number, date | EP20060005629 | 20.03.2006 Original published format: EP 06005629 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007107342 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005051 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2005051 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16L5/10 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
F16L5/10 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDUNG ZUM DYNAMISCHEN ABDICHTEN EINER ROHRHÜLSE DURCH WELCHES SICH EIN ROHR ODER KABEL ERSTRECKT | [2023/12] | English: | SYSTEM FOR DYNAMICALLY SEALING A CONDUIT SLEEVE THROUGH WHICH A PIPE OR CABLE EXTENDS | [2008/52] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR ÉTANCHÉIFIER DYNAMIQUEMENT UN CONDUIT TRAVERSÉ PAR UN TUYAU OU UN CÂBLE | [2023/12] |
Former [2008/52] | SYSTEM ZUR DYNAMISCHEN ABDICHTUNG EINER LEITUNGSMUFFE, DURCH DIE SICH EIN ROHR ODER KABEL ERSTRECKT | ||
Former [2008/52] | SYSTEME DE FERMETURE ETANCHE DYNAMIQUE D'UNE GAINE DE CANALISATION TRAVERSEE PAR UN TUYAU OU UN CABLE | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13151613.0 / EP2584236 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.04.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 26.04.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.05.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.03.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.05.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 08.05.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.06.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 30.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 24.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB916461 (ROBERT ALEXANDRE DE VIENNE, et al) [X] 19,20,22,23,28-30 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2169219 (WUNDERLICH HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-13,15,16,18-23,28,29,33-35 * page 3 - page 8; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US3793672 (WETMORE J) [X] 19,20,22,23,28-30* the whole document *; | [X]GB2057595 (AVON IND POLYMERS BRADFORD ON) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13,15,16,18-23,28,29,31,33-35 * page 1, line 121 - page 2, line 80; figures 1-6 *; | [X]DE3443284 (E VOGELSANG GMBH & CO KG DIPL [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,14-16,18,19,22,25 * abstract *; | [X]DE29605883U (SVT SYSTEM SERVICE GMBH [DE]) [X] 19,20,22,23,28-30 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0987482 (KROENER GMBH ARMATUREN UND DIC [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-22,28-35 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-11 *; | [X]DE20002216U (LIV PLASTIKA PREDELAVA PLASTIK [SI]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-13,15,16,18-23,27-29,33-35 * page 3 - page 4; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1101992 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-13,15,16,18-23,27-29,33-35 * abstract *; | [X]US2004045233 (BEELE JOHANNES ALFRED [NL]) [X] 1-8,10-16,18-23,28-36 * abstract *; | [XD]WO2004111513 (BEELE ENG BV [NL], et al) [XD] 1-8,10-16,18-23,28-36 * the whole document * | Examination | US3067425 | DE9204067U | EP0534563 | US5245131 | EP1022834 | DE10035006 | by applicant | GB2186442 | WO2004111513 |