EP1978947 - NITROOXYDERIVATIVES FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF MUSCULAR DYSTROPHIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/42] | USE OF NITROOXYDERIVATIVE OF DRUG FOR THE TREATMENT OF MUSCULAR DYSTROPHIES | ||
[2014/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicox Science Ireland Riverside One Sir John Rogerson's Quay Dublin 2 / IE | [2014/48] |
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states Nicox S.A. Drakkar 2, Bat D 2405 Route des Dolines CS 10313 Sophia Antipolis - Valbonne / FR | ||
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states NicOx S.A. Taissounières HB4 1681 route des Dolines, BP 313 06560 Sophia Antipolis - Valbonne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLEMENTI, Emilio Via Pindemonte 1 20129 Milano / IT | 02 /
COSSU, Giulio Via Poerio 30 20129 Milano / IT | 03 /
BRUNELLI, Silvia Via Pindemonte 1 20129 Milano / IT | 04 /
ONGINI, Ennio Via Fratelli Cervi Residenza Campo I-20090 Segrate / IT | [2014/33] |
Former [2008/42] | 01 /
CLEMENTI, Emilio Via Pindemonte 1 20129 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
COSSU, Giulio Via Poerio 30 20129 Milano / IT | |||
03 /
BRUNELLI, Silvia Via Pindemonte 1 20129 Milano / IT | |||
04 /
ONGINI, Ennio Via Fratelli Cervi Residenza Campo I-20090 Segrate / IT | Representative(s) | Barchielli, Giovanna, et al Bianchetti & Minoja with Trevisan & Cuonzo IPS Srl Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Barchielli, Giovanna, et al Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2008/42] | Barchielli, Giovanna Nicox Research Institute S.r.l., Patent Department, Via Ariosto, 21 20091 Bresso (Milano) / IT | Application number, filing date | 07712084.8 | 23.01.2007 | [2008/42] | WO2007EP50630 | Priority number, date | US20060764755P | 03.02.2006 Original published format: US 764755 P | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007088123 | Date: | 09.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1978947 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1978947 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/04, A61P21/00, A61K31/335, A61K31/38, A61K31/381, A61K31/401, A61K31/407, A61K31/415, A61K31/42, A61K31/436, A61K31/44, A61K31/505, A61K31/216, A61K31/235, A61K31/40, A61K31/404 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
A61K31/04 (EP,US);
C07D209/52 (KR);
A61K31/216 (EP,US);
A61K31/235 (EP,US);
A61K31/335 (EP,US);
A61K31/38 (EP,US);
A61K31/381 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/401 (EP,US);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/407 (EP,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/42] | A61K31/04, A61P21/00, A61K31/335, A61K31/38, A61K31/381, A61K31/401, A61K31/407, A61K31/415, A61K31/42, A61K31/436, A61K31/44, A61K31/505 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/42] | Extension states | AL | 08.07.2008 | BA | 08.07.2008 | HR | 08.07.2008 | MK | 08.07.2008 | RS | 08.07.2008 | Title | German: | NITROOXYDERIVATEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON MUSKULÄRER DYSTROPHIEN | [2014/11] | English: | NITROOXYDERIVATIVES FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF MUSCULAR DYSTROPHIES | [2014/11] | French: | DÉRIVÉS NITRO-OXYDES POUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DES DYSTROPHIES MUSCULAIRES | [2014/11] |
Former [2008/42] | VERWENDUNG EINES NITROOXYDERIVATS EINES HEILMITTELS ZUR BEHANDLUNG MUSKULÄRER DYSTROPHIEN | ||
Former [2008/42] | USE OF NITROOXYDERIVATIVE OF DRUG FOR THE TREATMENT OF MUSCULAR DYSTROPHIES | ||
Former [2008/42] | UTILISATION DE DERIVES NITRO-OXYDES DE MEDICAMENTS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE DYSTROPHIES MUSCULAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14175223.8 / EP2786749 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.08.2014 | EE | 13.08.2014 | LV | 13.08.2014 | SK | 13.08.2014 | BG | 13.11.2014 | IS | 13.12.2014 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 13.08.2014 | |
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
TR | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 13.08.2014 | |
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | LV | 13.08.2014 | |
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | BG | 13.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9530641 (NICOX LTD [IE], et al); | [DY]WO0053191 (UNIV MANITOBA [CA], et al); | [Y]EP1473288 (NICOX SA [FR]); | [DY]WO2004105754 (NICOX SA [FR], et al); | [Y]WO2005023305 (INPHARMATICA LTD [GB], et al); | Examination | - BRUNELLI SILVIA ET AL, "Nitric oxide release combined with nonsteroidal anti inflammatory activity prevents muscular dystrophy pathology and enhances stem cell therapy", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES - PNAS, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20070102), vol. 104, no. 1, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0608277104, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 264 - 269, XP002445669 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0608277104 | - CLARA SCIORATI ET AL, "A dual acting compound releasing nitric oxide (NO) and ibuprofen, NCX 320, shows significant therapeutic effects in a mouse model of muscular dystrophy", PHARMACOLOGICAL RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, vol. 64, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.PHRS.2011.05.003, ISSN 1043-6618, (20110505), pages 210 - 217, (20110512), XP028096923 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.phrs.2011.05.003 | by applicant | EP0759899 | WO0053191 | EP1194397 | WO2004105754 |