17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
16.09.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
05.02.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
03.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
06.03.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
20.02.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.02.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.02.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
31.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.10.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
04.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
26.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
02.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.10.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
03.10.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
27.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.07.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|