Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1986491 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2015 | B1 | EP1986491 | 05.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP51518 | 16.02.2007 | FR0650587 | 20.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1986491T | 22.06.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP51518 | 16.02.2007 | FR0650587 | 20.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2541310T | 17.07.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP51518 | 16.02.2007 | FR0650587 | 20.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1986491T | 31.08.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07712231 | 16.02.2007 | WO2007EP51518 | 16.02.2007 | FR0650587 | 20.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007096307 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0650587 | 20.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2897548 | 28.03.2008 | B1 | FR2897548 | 24.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0650587 | 20.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1986491E | 20.05.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | FR0650587 | 20.02.2006 |