EP1987150 - SELECTION OF HOST CELLS EXPRESSING PROTEIN AT HIGH LEVELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ChromaGenics B.V. Archimedesweg 4 2333 CN Leiden / NL | [2008/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTTE, Arie, Pieter Het Ruim 20 NL-3823 SG Amersfoort / NL | 02 /
VAN BLOKLAND, Henricus Johannes Maria Zuiderweg 69a NL-1456 NH Wijdewormer / NL | 03 /
KWAKS, Theodorus Hendrikus Jacobus Korte Vogelstraat 11 NL-1022 XW Amsterdam / NL | 04 /
SEWALT, Richard George Antonius Bernardus Van Lawick van Pabststraat 141 NL-6814 HD Arnhem / NL | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Verhage, Richard Abraham, et al Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V. Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Verhage, Richard Abraham, et al Crucell Holland B.V. IP Department Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | ||
Former [2008/45] | Verhage, Richard Abraham, et al Crucell Holland B.V. Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 07712283.6 | 21.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007EP51696 | Priority number, date | US20060359953 | 21.02.2006 Original published format: US 359953 | US20060416490 | 02.05.2006 Original published format: US 416490 | EP20060113354 | 02.05.2006 Original published format: EP 06113354 | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007096399 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1987150 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1987150 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/85 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
C12N15/65 (EP);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12N15/09 (KR);
C12N15/63 (KR);
C12N15/85 (EP);
C12P21/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Extension states | AL | 19.08.2008 | BA | 19.08.2008 | HR | 19.08.2008 | MK | 19.08.2008 | RS | 19.08.2008 | Title | German: | SELEKTION VON WIRTSZELLEN MIT PROTEINEXPRESSION AUF HOHEM NIVEAU | [2008/45] | English: | SELECTION OF HOST CELLS EXPRESSING PROTEIN AT HIGH LEVELS | [2008/45] | French: | SÉLECTION DE CELLULES HÔTES EXPRIMANT UNE PROTÉINE À DES NIVEAUX ÉLEVÉS | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 19.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   04.04.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2007 | CY | 01.06.2011 | EE | 01.06.2011 | LT | 01.06.2011 | LV | 01.06.2011 | RO | 01.06.2011 | SK | 01.06.2011 | TR | 01.06.2011 | BG | 01.09.2011 | GR | 02.09.2011 | IS | 01.10.2011 | LU | 21.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2017/03] |
Former [2016/36] | HU | 21.02.2007 | |
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
TR | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
LU | 21.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 21.02.2007 | |
CY | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
TR | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
LU | 21.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
TR | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
LU | 21.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
TR | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 01.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6319707 (ADAM MOHAMMED A [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 2 * * column 10, line 29 - line 39 * * table 1 *; | [A]WO03106684 (CHROMAGENICS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 27, line 4 - line 6 * * page 31, line 27 - page 32, line 1 * * page 32, line 20 - page 33, line 2 *; | [PX]WO2006048459 (CHROMAGENICS BV [NL], et al) [PX] 1-15 * abstract * * page 126; claim 4 *; | [PX]US2006195935 (OTTE ARIE P [NL], et al) [PX] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0117] *; | [XP] - VAN BLOKLAND ET AL, "A novel, high stringency selection system allows screening of few clones for high protein expression", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070113), vol. 128, no. 2, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 237 - 245, XP005829332 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - LOPEZ DE QUINTO S ET AL, "Parameters influencing translational efficiency in aphthovirus IRES-based bicistronic expression vectors", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199809), vol. 217, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 51 - 56, XP004149318 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(98)00379-5 |