EP2004348 - CRYSTALLISER HOLDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 41 33042 Buttrio / IT | [2017/30] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 41 35042 Buttrio / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLONI, Alfredo Via G. Paolini 29 I-34070 Fogliano Redipuglia / IT | 02 /
DE LUCA, Andrea Via Candotti 61 I-33047 Remanzacco / IT | 03 /
ANSOLDI, Marco Via Lombardia, 200 I-33100 Udine / IT | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/52] | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2008/52] | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07712305.7 | 23.02.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007EP51758 | Priority number, date | IT2006MI00335 | 24.02.2006 Original published format: IT MI20060335 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007096420 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2004348 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2004348 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/055, B22D11/053, B22D11/124 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
B22D11/055 (EP,US);
B22D11/053 (EP,US);
B22D11/124 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/14] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR KRISTALLISATOR | [2008/52] | English: | CRYSTALLISER HOLDING DEVICE | [2008/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT DE CRISTALLISEUR | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2007 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 23.02.2007 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 05.04.2017 | |
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 05.04.2017 | |
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE867735 (VER LEICHTMETALLWERKE GMBH) [Y] 9-13* figure .; claims 1,2 *; | [XY]WO9853935 (WURTH PAUL SA [LU], et al) [X] 1,2,3,4 * page 6, line 1 - page 11, line 15; figures 1-8 * [Y] 9-13 |