EP1993808 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A THREE-DIMENSIONALLY SHAPED SANDWICH STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RECTICEL Automobilsysteme GmbH Rolandsecker Weg 30 53619 Rheinbreitbach / DE | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRACKE, Kristiaan Burg. De Lausnaystraat 11 B-9230 Berlare (Overmere) / BE | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Van Reet, Joseph, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Van Reet, Joseph, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 07712467.5 | 07.03.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007EP52146 | Priority number, date | EP20060110859 | 08.03.2006 Original published format: EP 06110859 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007101868 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1993808 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1993808 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/08, B29C51/14 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
B29C51/087 (EP,US);
B29D24/005 (EP);
B31D3/0284 (EP,US);
B29C35/00 (EP,US);
B29C51/04 (EP,US);
B29C51/14 (EP,US);
B29C51/145 (EP,US);
B29K2001/00 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0836 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0845 (EP,US);
B29K2105/128 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0069 (EP,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DREIDIMENSIONAL GEFORMTEN SANDWICHSTRUKTUR | [2008/48] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A THREE-DIMENSIONALLY SHAPED SANDWICH STRUCTURE | [2008/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE STRUCTURE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE DE TYPE SANDWICH | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 17.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2010 | CY | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | IT | 07.07.2010 | LT | 07.07.2010 | LV | 07.07.2010 | MT | 07.07.2010 | NL | 07.07.2010 | PL | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SE | 07.07.2010 | SI | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | ES | 18.10.2010 | IS | 07.11.2010 | PT | 08.11.2010 | GB | 07.03.2011 | IE | 07.03.2011 | LU | 07.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | FR | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
TR | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
GB | 07.03.2011 | ||
IE | 07.03.2011 | ||
LU | 07.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
GB | 07.03.2011 | ||
IE | 07.03.2011 | ||
LU | 07.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
GB | 07.03.2011 | ||
IE | 07.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04308732 ; | [A]JPS62142628 ; | [X]US3115678 (ROLLIN KEEN WILLIAM, et al) [X] 1-15,17-20 * column 2, line 12 - column 5, line 5; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US4690666 (ALEXANDER GAROLD W [US], et al) [X] 1-15,17-20 * column 3, line 46 - column 6, line 45; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US5151277 (BERNARDON EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15,17-20 * figure 16 *; | [A]US2001045684 (BLANCHON CHARLES-GUILLAUME [FR]) [A] 1-15,17-20* figure 9 *; | [A]EP1211051 (R & S TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15,17-20 * figures 6-9 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930317), vol. 017, no. 126, Database accession no. (M - 1381), & JP04308732 A 19921030 (KASAI KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1-15,17-20 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871202), vol. 011, no. 368, Database accession no. (M - 647), & JP62142628 A 19870626 (TAKASHIMAYA NITSUPATSU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-15,17-20 * abstract * |