EP2002681 - METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR INTERFACING AND CONNECTING A WIRELESS DEVICE AND A WIRELESS NETWORK USING A SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE HAVING PLURAL IMSI ASSOCIATED WITH DIFFERENT NETWORK OPERATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shoo 533 Limited 3rd Floor Denmark Court 18 Market Place Wokingham, Berkshire RG40 1AL / GB | [2013/29] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states Ghost Telecom Limited Lodge Farm, Village Road, Dorney Berkshire SL4 6QJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMILLERI, Michael Lodge Farm, Village Road Dorney Berkshire SL4 6QJ / GB | 02 /
MERINO GONZALEZ, Jose Luis Urb. Punta Lara 26B Nerja E-29780 Malaga / ES | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Langley, Peter James Origin Limited Twisden Works Twisden Road London NW5 1DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | Langley, Peter James Origin Limited, 52 Muswell Hill Road London N10 3JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07712853.6 | 07.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007GB00799 | Priority number, date | GB20060004573 | 07.03.2006 Original published format: GB 0604573 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007102003 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2002681 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/32 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
H04W8/183 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANSCHALTUNG UND VERBINDUNG EINES DRAHTLOSEN GERÄTS UND EINES DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES TEILNEHMERIDENTITÄTSMODULS MIT MEHREREN MIT VERSCHIEDENEN NETZBETREIBERN ASSOZIIERTEN IMSI | [2008/51] | English: | METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR INTERFACING AND CONNECTING A WIRELESS DEVICE AND A WIRELESS NETWORK USING A SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE HAVING PLURAL IMSI ASSOCIATED WITH DIFFERENT NETWORK OPERATORS | [2008/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DESTINÉS À L'INTERFAÇAGE ET À LA CONNEXION D'UN DISPOSITIF SANS FIL ET RÉSEAU SANS FIL UTILISANT UN MODULE D'IDENTITÉ D'ABONNÉ À PLUSIEURS IMSI ASSOCIÉS À DIFFÉRENTS OPÉRATEURS DE RÉSEAUX | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 18.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2017 | 08.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/13] | 18.11.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/13] | 21.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9955107 (SWISSCOM AG [CH], et al); | [X]FR2790161 (SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMS & SERVICE [FR]); | [X]FR2814030 (TRANSATEL [FR]) | Examination | US5987325 |