EP2005794 - A METHOD OF MAKING A HEATER STRUCTURE AND A HEATER STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GKN Aerospace Services Limited Ferry Road, East Cowes Isle of Wight, PO32 6RA / GB | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARDWELL, Anthony GKN Aerospace Transparency Systems (Luton) Ltd Percival Way London Luton Airport Luton, Bedfordshire LU2 9PQ / GB | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Albutt, Anthony John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Albutt, Anthony John D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07712922.9 | 16.03.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007GB00933 | Priority number, date | GB20060005453 | 17.03.2006 Original published format: GB 0605453 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007107713 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005794 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2005794 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/00, B64D15/12 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
B64D15/12 (EP,GB,US);
B60N2/00 (GB);
B61D27/0045 (GB);
E01B7/24 (GB);
F02C7/047 (GB);
H01C3/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER HEIZKÖRPERSTRUKTUR UND HEIZKÖRPERSTRUKTUR | [2008/52] | English: | A METHOD OF MAKING A HEATER STRUCTURE AND A HEATER STRUCTURE | [2008/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE CHAUFFANTE ET STRUCTURE CHAUFFANTE AINSI FABRIQUÉE | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 09.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.2009 | BE | 09.09.2009 | BG | 09.09.2009 | CY | 09.09.2009 | CZ | 09.09.2009 | DK | 09.09.2009 | EE | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | LT | 09.09.2009 | LV | 09.09.2009 | MT | 09.09.2009 | NL | 09.09.2009 | PL | 09.09.2009 | RO | 09.09.2009 | SI | 09.09.2009 | SK | 09.09.2009 | TR | 09.09.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | IS | 09.01.2010 | PT | 11.01.2010 | HU | 10.03.2010 | IE | 16.03.2010 | LU | 16.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 16.03.2010 | ||
LU | 16.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 16.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IE | 16.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IE | 16.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IE | 16.03.2010 | ||
IT | 16.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2791668 (LOUIS COWDREY CECIL, et al); | [X]GB832778 (NAPIER & SON LTD); | [X]GB832777 (NAPIER & SON LTD); | [XI]GB833675 (NAPIER & SONS LTD D); | [A]GB2121745 (WESTLAND PLC) |