EP2005178 - A CHEMICAL SENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivacta Limited 100 Guillat Avenue Kent Science Park Sittingbourne Kent ME9 8GU / GB | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARTER, Timothy, Joseph, Nicholas 100 Guillat Avenue Kent Science Park Sittingbourne Kent ME9 8GU / GB | 02 /
ROSS, Steven, Andrew 100 Guillat Avenue Kent Science Park Sittingbourne Kent ME9 8GU / GB | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
Former [2008/52] | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07712925.2 | 16.03.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007GB00938 | Priority number, date | GB20060005452 | 17.03.2006 Original published format: GB 0605452 | US20060786808P | 29.03.2006 Original published format: US 786808 P | US20060811110P | 06.06.2006 Original published format: US 811110 P | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007107716 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005178 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | CHEMISCHE WAHRNEHMUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/52] | English: | A CHEMICAL SENSING DEVICE | [2008/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION CHIMIQUE | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 24.02.2012 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 25.04.2012 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 15.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/02] | 08.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO2004090512 (PIEZOPTIC LTD [GB], et al) [DX] 1-29 * abstract * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 1; example 1 *; | [A]WO9013017 (HEALTH LAB SERVICE BOARD [GB]) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * figure 1; claims 1-26 *; | [A] - SHEN G ET AL, "Detection of antisperm antibody in human serum using a piezoelectric immunosensor based on mixed self-assembled monolayers", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050601), vol. 540, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2670, pages 279 - 284, XP004889838 [A] 1-29 * abstract * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.aca.2005.03.035 | [A] - SUSMEL ET AL, "A piezoelectric immunosensor based on antibody entrapment within a non-totally rigid polymeric film", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (20051111), vol. 111-112, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 331 - 338, XP005088360 [A] 1-29 * abstract * * page 337, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2004.11.052 |